Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Kyle C Dudek
Referred: Kyle C Dudek
Case #: 2:22-cv-00090
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2022
Terminated:Oct 31, 2022
Last checked: Monday Aug 08, 2022 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Christopher Mellgren
individually 3252 NE 1st Ave Suite 205
Miami, FL 33137
Represented By
John Cody German
Cole, Scott & Kissane, PA
contact info
Erika Agosto
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Steven Ehrlich
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Surfside Coffee Company, LLC
a foreign limited liability company CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY 1201 HAYS STREET
TALLAHASSEE,, FL 32301
Represented By
John Cody German
Cole, Scott & Kissane, PA
contact info
Erika Agosto
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Steven Ehrlich
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Travis Campbell
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 6350 Presidential Court
Fort Myers, FL 33919
Represented By
Maria Alaimo
Viles & Beckman, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, October 31, 2022
39 39 misc Judgment Mon 10/31 9:52 AM
JUDGMENT (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (SPB)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 30, 2022
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Sun 10/30 9:54 PM
ORDER. This action is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment, deny all pending motions, terminate all scheduled events, and close the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 10/28/2022. (Dudek, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
37 37 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Fri 10/28 2:27 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Travis Campbell (Alaimo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
35 35 1 pgs order Order on consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/27 9:18 AM
ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/27/2022. (LMF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/27 9:20 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:22-cv-90-KCD. Judge Sheri Polster Chappell no longer assigned to the case. (LMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
34 34 misc Consent to Magistrate Judge Disposition on Motion Wed 10/26 1:38 PM
CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Disposition on Motion by Travis Campbell re30 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice . (Alaimo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
33 33 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 10/25 4:51 PM
Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek: MOTION HEARING held on 10/25/2022 re30 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Travis Campbell. (Digital) (CGW)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 10/25 9:10 AM
ENDORSED ORDER. The Court requests that the parties read the following case, King v. Sch. Bd. of Charlotte Cnty., Fla., No. 2:22-CV-277-KCD, 2022 WL 4110289, at *1 (M.D. Fla. Sept. 8, 2022), in advance of the telephonic hearing this morning. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 10/25/2022. (Dudek, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
notice Notice of hearing on motion Fri 10/21 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing re30 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice . Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2022 at 11:45 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-888-684-8852. The access code is 1982804. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 22090. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
30 30 motion Settlement Thu 10/20 4:48 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Travis Campbell.(Alaimo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
29 29 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Thu 10/20 4:42 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Travis Campbell (Alaimo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
27 27 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Wed 10/19 11:44 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Travis Campbell (Alaimo, Maria)
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 10/19 1:33 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice for Christopher Mellgren (Doc. 27 ) because Defendant Christopher Mellgren has appeared in this case and did not sign the Notice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(ii). The parties thus must file a proper stipulation of dismissal on or before October 24, 2022. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/19/2022. (LAF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 17, 2022
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Sat 09/17 1:42 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Joint Motion to Extend Mediation Deadline. The Court finds good cause to extend the current mediation deadline. However, the requested extension is not justified. The Court will allow the parties 30 additional days to mediate this case, putting the new mediation deadline at 10/20/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 9/17/2022. (Dudek, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/16 3:41 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Extend Mediation Deadline by All Defendants. (Agosto, Erika)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
23 23 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Tue 08/09 12:03 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on September 20, 2022 at 1:00 PM before Norman S. Gerstein, Esq.. (Alaimo, Maria)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 08/09 12:01 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Extend Mediation Deadline by Travis Campbell. (Alaimo, Maria)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 08/09 1:23 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Joint Motion to Extend Mediation Deadline. The mediation deadline is extended to September 20, 2022. Although the parties chose a mediator that is not on the Court's list of certified mediators, the Court approves Norman S. Gerstein as a mediator in this case. Future filings must comply with Local Rule 1.08 governing typography (typeface must be Book Antiqua, Calisto MT, Century Schoolbook, Georgia, or Palatino; Times New Roman is permitted if the main text is at least 14-point, with other requirements). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 8/9/2022. (BLW)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
order Order Mon 08/08 10:54 AM
ENDORSED ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on sua sponte review of the file. The parties have missed their deadline to file a Notice of Mediation 14 days before the mediation deadline. (Doc. 16 ). Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS the parties to show cause why they missed that deadline on or before August 9, 2022, or, alternatively, file the notice by that same date. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/8/2022. (LAF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/01 6:26 PM
Case Reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Kyle C Dudek. New case number: 2:22-cv-90-SPC-KCD. Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy no longer assigned to the case. (LMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
19 19 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Fri 06/24 2:24 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories by Travis Campbell. (Alaimo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
order Order Wed 06/22 3:37 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on sua sponte review of the FCRA Fast-Track Scheduling Order. (Doc. 16 ). Plaintiff has missed the deadline to file verified answers to the Court's interrogatories. The Court thus ORDERS him to show cause, in writing, on or before June 27, 2022, why he has missed the deadline, or alternatively file the verified answers by that same date. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/22/2022. (BLW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/26 11:17 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Christopher Mellgren, Surfside Coffee Company, LLC. (Agosto, Erika)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
16 16 order Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order Thu 04/21 2:09 PM
FLSA FAST TRACK SCHEDULING ORDER. See order for Court deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/21/2022. (AEH)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
15 15 order Order on Motion for Clerks Default Fri 04/15 5:05 PM
TEXT ORDER denying as moot and without prejudice 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Default. Defendants have now responded to Plaintiff's Collective Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. ( See Doc. 14 ). As a result, the Court finds Plaintiff's Motion for Default (Doc. 11 ) is due to be denied as moot and without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/15/2022. (CM)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/15 4:11 PM
Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Christopher Mellgren, Surfside Coffee Company, LLC.(German, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of appearance Fri 04/15 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Agosto on behalf of Christopher Mellgren, Surfside Coffee Company, LLC (Agosto, Erika)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of appearance Fri 04/15 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Cody German on behalf of Christopher Mellgren, Surfside Coffee Company, LLC (German, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Clerks Default Fri 04/15 9:36 AM
MOTION for Clerk's Default against Surfside Coffee Company, LLC by Travis Campbell. (Alaimo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
10 10 order Order Fri 04/08 1:45 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on sua sponte review of the file. Plaintiff, as the party entitled to a default, has not applied for default within 28 days of Defendant Surfside Coffee Company, LLC's failure to plead or otherwise defend against this action. Accordingly, Plaintiff must show cause by April 15, 2022, why he has not applied for default. Alternatively, Plaintiff can file a motion for clerk's default by the same date. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/8/2022. (BLW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 03/03 3:13 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Travis Campbell. Related case(s): No (Alaimo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
8 8 service Certificate of service Mon 02/28 4:36 PM
CERTIFICATE of service by Travis Campbell on Surfside Coffee Company, LLC . (Alaimo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 02/10 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Maria Alaimo on behalf of Travis Campbell. Lead Counsel: Maria R. Alaimo. (Alaimo, Maria) Modified to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 2/10/2022 (JK)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons issued Thu 02/10 11:30 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Christopher Mellgren. (JK)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons issued Thu 02/10 11:30 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Surfside Coffee Company, LLC. (JK)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 02/10 11:29 AM
NOTICE to counsel Maria Alaimo of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Civil Action Order Thu 02/10 11:29 AM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/10/2022. (JK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
2 2 utility *Remark Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/09 4:29 PM
Remark, NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-0090-SPC-MRM. (SJB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/09 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19218469) filed by Travis Campbell.(Alaimo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons