Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-01573
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2022
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Monday Aug 08, 2022 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
STEVEN FORTIER
Represented By
BUFFY K MARTINES
Laminack Pirtle & Martines - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 06, 2022
4 4 24 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/12 4:51 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/09 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BUFFY K MARTINES on behalf of STEVEN FORTIER (MARTINES, BUFFY)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/09 2:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MARTINES, BUFFY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/09 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6677012.), filed by STEVEN FORTIER. (MARTINES, BUFFY)
Related: [-]