BARTKO v. TD BANK USA N.A. et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Christy Criswell Wiegand |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00239 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Feb 09, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 08, 2022 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
TD BANK USA N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SUSAN BARTKO
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
TRANSUNION, LLC
Terminated: 06/22/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
order
Order
Fri 06/24 10:17 AM
ORDER that, in light of35 Stipulation of Dismissal of TD BANK USA N.A., this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 6/24/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) |
||
Thursday, June 23, 2022 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty)
Thu 06/23 3:12 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of TD Bank USA N.A. with prejudice, by SUSAN BARTKO. (Moore, John) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 06/22 3:35 PM
ORDER GRANTING32 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by TRANSUNION, LLC. TRANSUNION, LLC terminated with prejudice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 6/22/2022. (jmm) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2022 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Proposed Order
Tue 06/21 10:48 AM
Proposed Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Trans Union, LLC Only by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Cangany, Warren) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty)
Tue 06/21 10:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff And Defendant Trans Union, LLC Only by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Cangany, Warren) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 05/24 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by SUSAN BARTKO (Moore, John) |
|
order
Order for Statistical Case Closing
Tue 05/24 2:17 PM
ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING: In light of30 Notice of Settlement advising the Court that the case has been resolved, Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED, pending the parties filing a stipulation of dismissal. Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or joint status report regarding settlement on or before 6/23/2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all hearings and deadlines in this case are cancelled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court expressly retains jurisdiction in this matter to consider any issue arising during the period when settlement is being finalized, including, but not limited to, enforcing settlement. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 5/24/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) |
||
Friday, April 22, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
order
Case Management Order
Fri 04/22 3:43 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 5/4/2022; Motion to Add New Parties and/or Amend Pleadings due by 5/20/2022; ADR to take place by 6/29/2022; Fact Discovery due by 9/19/2022; Confidential Position Papers due by 9/21/2022; Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 9/26/2022 at 9:00 AM via Telephonic Conference before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand. (jmm) |
|
28 | 28
minutes
Initial Case Management Conference
Fri 04/22 3:35 PM
Minute Entry for Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand held on 4/20/2022. (Court Reporter: None) (jmm) |
|
27 | 27
adr
Stipulation Selecting ADR process
Fri 04/22 1:40 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Cangany, Warren) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extend Time
Wed 04/20 8:33 AM
MOTION to Extend Time to complete mediation by TD BANK USA N.A.. (Leonard, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wed 04/20 8:58 AM
ORDER GRANTING25 Motion to Extend Time to Complete Mediation. In light of the parties' representation that Judge Benson's first available date to conduct the mediation is 6/29/2022 and all parties are available on that date, the Court HEREBY GRANTS the25 Motion to Extend Time to Complete Mediation. Parties shall file a revised ADR stipulation on or before 4/22/2022. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 4/20/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) |
||
Thursday, April 14, 2022 | ||
order
Order
Thu 04/14 9:35 AM
ORDER re22 Stipulation Selecting ADR Process. The parties' ADR Stipulation is hereby STRICKEN. The parties are directed to refile an ADR stipulation selecting a date certain for the mediation session that is within sixty (60) days of the Initial Case Management Conference. See ADR Policies and Procedures, Section 3.4.B (available at: https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/ADR_Policies_and_Procedures_112818.pdf. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 4/14/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) |
||
Wednesday, April 13, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Wed 04/13 4:45 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cangany, Warren) |
|
22 | 22
adr
Stipulation Selecting ADR process
Wed 04/13 4:40 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Cangany, Warren) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Continue
Fri 04/08 12:09 PM
MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by TD BANK USA N.A.. (Leonard, Rebecca) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Fri 04/08 2:56 PM
ORDER re20 Motion to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by TD BANK USA N.A. Defendant's20 Motion is DENIED without prejudice. The Court does not anticipate the initial scheduling conference in this matter will exceed 30 minutes. The conference will occur as scheduled per14 Order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 4/8/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) |
||
Wednesday, April 06, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 04/06 9:31 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Collin M. Mockbee by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Mockbee, Collin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 04/06 4:18 PM
ORDER GRANTING18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Collin M Mockbee terminated. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 4/6/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) |
||
Monday, April 04, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Errata
Mon 04/04 10:26 AM
Errata re15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, For Warren F. Cangany, Esq. (Amended) by TRANSUNION, LLC. Reason for Correction: Submitting Certificate Of Good Standing. (Cangany, Warren) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/04 3:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING15 Motion for Warren F. Cangany to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 4/4/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) |
||
Friday, April 01, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
Fri 04/01 3:23 PM
MOTION for attorney Warren F. Cangany to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7033358) by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Cangany, Warren) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Of Warren F. Cangany, Esq. In Support Of Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order On Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice Of Warren F. Cangany, Esq. | ||
misc
QC - Motion to Appear PHV
Fri 04/01 4:39 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. ERROR: Filer did not attach Certificate of Good Standing CORRECTION: See LCvR 83.2(B) PRO HAC VICE ADMISSIONS. A motion for admission pro hac vice must be made by the attorney seeking to be admitted (using their own login info) and must be accompanied by an affidavit from the attorney seeking to be admitted pro hac vice and a current Certificate of Good Standing. Attorney seeking admission is advised submit a Certificate of Good Standing and using ERRATA event (so as to avoid repaying the filing fee), link filing to the previously filed motion (jd) |
||
Friday, March 25, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order
Fri 03/25 2:05 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2022 at 9:30 AM via Telephonic Conference before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 4/6/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report and ADR Stipulation due by 4/13/2022. Confidential Position Letters due by 4/15/2022. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 3/25/2022. (jmm) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/23 11:51 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by TD BANK USA N.A.. (Leonard, Rebecca) |
|
Tuesday, February 22, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1)
Tue 02/22 1:28 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying The Toronto-Dominion Bank as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TD BANK USA N.A.. (Leonard, Rebecca) |
|
Thursday, February 17, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 02/17 3:06 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by TD BANK USA N.A. Answer due from TD BANK USA N.A. on 3/23/2022. (Leonard, Rebecca) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/17 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Elizabeth Leonard on behalf of TD BANK USA N.A.. (Leonard, Rebecca) |
|
Wednesday, February 16, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/16 4:38 PM
TRANS UNION, LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Mockbee, Collin) |
|
Friday, February 11, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/11 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John V Moore on behalf of SUSAN BARTKO. (Moore, John) |
|
Thursday, February 10, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/10 4:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING6 Motion for Collin M. Mockbee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 2/10/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
Thu 02/10 3:44 PM
MOTION for attorney Collin M. Mockbee to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6945834) by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Mockbee, Collin) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Collin M. Mockbee, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents
Thu 02/10 2:51 PM
AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jmm) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 02/10 2:49 PM
ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 2/10/2022. (jmm) |
|
3 | 3
adr
Notice of ADR Designation
Thu 02/10 2:48 PM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm) |
|
Wednesday, February 09, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1)
Wed 02/09 3:48 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying Trans Union LLC, TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc, TransUnion, TRU, T. Rowe Price Group, Inc, TROW as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Greenfield, Stanley) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (for Clerk of Court personnel only)
Wed 02/09 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from ALLEGHENY COUNTY, case number GD-21-009595 with PLAINTIFF Copies attached: Lower Court Complaint, Exhibits, Notice of Filing (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6941153), filed by TRANSUNION, LLC. (jd) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A Notice to Defend, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B Complaint to Transunion, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C Summons served on Transunion, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D Consent to Removal, | ||
Att: 6 Lower Court Order of Removal, | ||
Att: 7 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal |