Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Gary Feinerman
Case #: 1:22-cv-00740
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause02:431 Fed. Election Commission: Failure Enforce Compliance
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2022
Terminated:Jul 21, 2022
Case in other court:Washington Western, 2:22-mc-00006
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 09, 2022 4:06 AM CDT
Defendant
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside
Chicago, IL 60606
Represented By
Todd W. Rosencrans
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Movant
Mary Jean Olsen
Represented By
Todd W. Rosencrans
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Allen Cheung
Plaintiff
Linda Verboom Curry


Docket last updated: 02/10/2022 11:40 AM CST
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
Case assigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (ST) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/10/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Quash Non-Party Mary Jean Olsen's Subpoena and Unopposed Request to Transfer to the District where the Underlying Action is Pending, filed by In Re Mary Jean Olsen. (Atty: Todd W. Rosencrans) Noting Date 2/18/2022. Related [+] (Filer advised to pay filing fee via ECF)(ST) Modified on 2/2/2022. Filing fee receipt# added to docket. Exhibits should have been posted to3 Declaration of Todd W. Rosencrans. (ST) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/10/2022.]
Related: [-] ceipt#: AWAWDC-7424451
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Deposition of David Space,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Deposition of Jeanne Yu,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Boeing Emails,
Att: 5 PROPOSED Order,
Att: 6 Email from Filer
2 2 DECLARATION of Sandra A. Edwards re1 Motion to Quash Subpoena. (ST) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/10/2022.]
Related: [-]
3 3 DECLARATION of Todd W. Rosencrans re1 Motion to Quash Subpoena. (ST) (ST). [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/10/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 3 (2/2/2022) Exhibit A - Subpoena,
Att: 4 (2/2/2022) Exhibit B - Deposition of David Space,
Att: 5 (2/2/2022) Exhibit C - Deposition of Jeanne Yu,
Att: 6 (2/2/2022) Exhibit D - Boeing Emails
4 4 DECLARATION of Non-Party Mary Jean Olsen re1 Motion to Quash. (ST) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/10/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee payment receipt number AWAWDC-7424451 (Rosencrans, Todd) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/10/2022.]
Related: [-]
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/9/2022. (ST) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/10/2022.]
Related: [-]
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification. Exhibits A-D should have been attached to the3 Declaration of Todd W. Rosencrans instead of the1 Motion to Quash. The exhibits have been stricken from the1 Motion to Quash and posted as attachments to the3 Declaration of Todd W. Rosencrans. (ST) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/10/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
6 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING NON-PARTY MARY JEAN OLSEN'S1 MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Clerk is directed to transfer the matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois for consideration of the pending Motion to Quash related to the matter of Curry v The Boeing Company , case number 1:20-cv-03088. (ST) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/10/2022.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
5 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Boeing Company (Rosencrans, Todd) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/10/2022.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
7 7 RECEIVED from Washington Western; Case Number 2:22-mc-00006 (aee).
Related: [-]
8 8 Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (aee, )
Related: [-]