Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:22-bk-30060

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:22-ap-03023
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2022
Terminated:Dec 07, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Arriba Motors
Arriba Motors 23475 US Hwy 59 N
Porter, TX 77365
Represented By
Arriba Motors
contact info
Plaintiff
Jamil Rafeal Tharp
1000 Greens Rd. Apt. 2001
Houston, TX 77060
Represented By
Eloise A Guzman
Guzman Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, December 09, 2022
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/09 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
10 10 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 12/07 3:12 PM
Agreed Order Dismissing Complaint and Closing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 12/7/2022. (VrianaPortillo)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
9 9 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 10/05 11:21 AM
Agreed Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Jamil Rafeal Tharp (Guzman, Eloise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, March 12, 2022
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Sat 03/12 1:29 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Arriba Motors (Knabeschuh, Don)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, February 12, 2022
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/12 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/12/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Friday, February 11, 2022
6 6 court Summons Issued Fri 02/11 9:54 AM
Summons Issued on Susanty Arnesen Date Issued 2/11/2022. (rkon)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Summons Issued Fri 02/11 9:50 AM
Summons Issued on CPA Santos PC Date Issued 2/11/2022. (rkon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
4 4 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Thu 02/10 10:48 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Susanty Arnesen, Managing Member. (Guzman, Eloise)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Thu 02/10 10:47 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on CPA Santos, PC, registered agent. (Guzman, Eloise)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Thu 02/10 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Wed 02/09 7:36 PM
Adversary case 22-03023 Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint Seeking Damages for Violation of Automatic Stay and for Turnover of Property by Jamil Rafeal Tharp against Arriba Motors. Fee Amount $350 (Guzman, Eloise)
Related: [-]