CLARK v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-01709 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 09, 2022 4:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
BRANDON CLARK
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, February 17, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WALLACE, EDWARD) |
|
3 | 3
![]() COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6706287.), filed by BRANDON CLARK. (WALLACE, EDWARD) |
|
Tuesday, February 15, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 02/15 11:26 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO FILER - Please file the Complaint in this case. This case is a direct filed case not a transition. You cannot use the1 Refiled Short Form Complaint - MDL cases only, when opening a new civil case. No judges are assigned. (djb) |
|
Friday, February 11, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by BRANDON CLARK. (WALLACE, EDWARD) |