Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Denise Page Hood
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:22-cv-10277
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2022
Terminated:Apr 28, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 09, 2022 4:53 AM EDT
Defendant
Barrington Romulus Apartments, LLC
Represented By
Timothy J. Clifford
Law Offices Of Catherine A. Gofrank
contact info
Defendant
Mr. Louis Hill
22645 Kean Street
Inkster, MI 48141
Represented By
Lauren M. Wawrzyniak
Zausmer, P.C.
contact info
Mark J. Zausmer
Zausmer, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
RA: Louis Hill Hill's Support Services, Inc.
26726 Lehigh
Inkster, MI 48141
Represented By
Lauren M. Wawrzyniak
Zausmer, P.C.
contact info
Mark J. Zausmer
Zausmer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Briggs
Represented By
Jay G. Yasso
Sommers Schwartz
contact info
Plaintiff
Katlyn Jenno
Represented By
Jay G. Yasso
Sommers Schwartz
contact info


Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago
Friday, April 28, 2023
58 58 3 pgs order Dismissing Case Fri 04/28 5:04 PM
ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiffs' Cause of Action Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
57 57 6 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 04/26 3:08 PM
REPLY to Response re52 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Louis Hill, RA: Louis Hill Hill's Support Services, Inc.. (Wawrzyniak, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
56 56 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 04/21 1:01 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Amended by All Plaintiffs. (Yasso, Jay)
Related: [-]
55 55 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 04/21 12:48 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Yasso, Jay)
Related: [-]