Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark X Mullin
Case #: 4:22-bk-40286
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Mar 09, 2022

Debtor
RedTail ECF, LLC
3815 Lisbon St Ste 100
Fort Worth, TX 76107-5699
Represented By
Jeff P. Prostok
Forshey & Prostok, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Marilyn Garner
Law Offices of Marilyn D. Garner 2001 E. Lamar Blvd., Suite 200
Arlington, TX 76006
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 02/11/2022 12:02 AM CST
Thursday, February 10, 2022
crditcrd none Thu 02/10 1:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload)([LINK 22-40286 7] ) [caseupld,1027u] ( 338.00). Receipt number A29318015, amount $ 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (case upload) Thu 02/10 1:27 PM
Non-Individual Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload) filed by Jeff P. Prostok on behalf of RedTail ECF, LLC. (Prostok, Jeff)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign Thu 02/10 1:31 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/9/2022 at 09:30 AM by TELEPHONE. (Prostok, Jeff)
Related: [-]