Original Case: 9:21-cv-81573

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-prici-10417
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2022
Last checked: Friday Feb 11, 2022 3:19 AM EST
Petitioner - Appellee
JOSE MARIA ROSA ROSALES
Represented By
Sydney Alexander
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Nicole Sofia Alvarez
Holland, Knight LLP
contact info
Brett Alan Barfield
PAG Law, PLLC
contact info
Joaquin Jose Alemany
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
ILONA GRABARCZYK
Represented By
Ilona Grabarczyk
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/11/2022 3:19 AM EST
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
***EXPEDITED***CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Ilona Grabarczyk on 02/07/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Transcript order form due 2/17/2022, if transcripts ordered court reporter must file on an expedited basis. Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/24/2022 as to Appellant Ilona Grabarczyk. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/10/2022 as to Appellee Jose Maria Rosa Rosales
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 22 pgs DC order#51
Att: 3 2 pgs DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties