Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-22106

Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Carlota M Bohm
Case #: 2:22-ap-02006
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2022
Terminated:May 04, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania, Department Of Revenue
4th and Walnut Street
Harrisburg, PA 17128
Represented By
Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania, Department Of Revenue
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Edward Chonko, Sr.
105 Cameron Drive
Irwin, PA 15642
Represented By
Albert G. Reese, Jr.
Law Office Of Albert G. Reese, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
13 13 court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Wed 05/04 4:21 PM
Adversary Case 2:22-ap-2006 Closed., Disposition of Adversary Judgment For Plaintiff (lfin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/16 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, April 14, 2022
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/14 6:30 AM
Certificate of Service of Default Order of Court. Filed by Paul Edward Chonko Sr. Related [+].
Related: [-] :10 Order on Motion for Default Judgmentese, Albert
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
10 10 order Default Judgment Wed 04/13 3:21 PM
Default Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] Signed on 4/13/2022. (lfin)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
9 9 misc Certificate of No Objection Tue 04/12 2:27 PM
Certificate of No Objection REGARDING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT Filed by Plaintiff Paul Edward Chonko Sr. Related [+].
Related: [-] :7 Hearing Setese, Albert
Saturday, March 26, 2022
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Sat 03/26 7:49 AM
Certificate of Service of Motion for Default Judgment, Proposed Order and Order and Notice Setting Hearing Date. Regarding the Hearing on 5/5/2022. Filed by Paul Edward Chonko Sr. Related [+].
Related: [-] :6 Motion for Default Judgment,7 Hearing Setese, Albert
Friday, March 25, 2022
7 7 court Hearing Set Fri 03/25 4:52 PM
Order Setting Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/5/2022 at 10:00 AM via Zoom - Bohm. Responses due by 4/11/2022. (dric)
Related: [-] :6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Paul Edward Chonko
Thursday, March 24, 2022
6 6 motion Default Judgment Thu 03/24 11:30 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Paul Edward Chonko Sr. Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Albert
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, February 14, 2022
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 02/14 2:24 PM
Summons Service Executed on Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania, Department Of Revenue 2/14/2022 . Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Albert
4 4 utility Corrective Entry Mon 02/14 12:34 PM
Corrective Entry: THE NATURE OF THE SUITE HAS BEEN CHANGED PER THE FILING ATTORNEY TO (21)VALIDITY, PRIORITY OR EXTENT OF LIEN OR OTHER INTEREST IN PROPERTY. Related [+]. (aala)
Related: [-] :1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Paul Edward Chonko
Friday, February 11, 2022
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 02/11 3:22 PM
One Summons Issued on Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania, Department Of Revenue Date Issued 2/11/2022, Answer Due 3/14/2022 (dric)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Corrective Entry Fri 02/11 2:06 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: IN THE FUTURE, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF MUST ENTER THE COMPLETE AND CORRECT NAME(S)OF ALL PLAINTIFF(S)/DEFENDANT(S) NAMED IN THE COMPLAINT WHEN THE CASE IS OPENED. THE CLERK'S OFFICE HAS ADDED THIS INFORMATION FROM THE IDENTIFYING INFORMATION CONTAINED WITHIN THE COMPLIANT. Related [+]. (llea)
Related: [-] :1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Department of Revenue, Defendant Paul Edward Chonko, Plaintiff Paul Edward Chonko
Thursday, February 10, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/10 8:03 PM
Adversary case 22-02006 Complaint SECTION 506 ACTION TO DETERMINE SECURED STATUS by Paul Edward Chonko Sr., Department of Revenue against Paul Edward Chonko Sr.. Receipt Number NFR, Fee Amount $ 350. Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Albert
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit