Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-01807
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2022
Terminated:Mar 27, 2023
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:22-cv-00302
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 10, 2022 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Plaintiff
RICHARD YORK
Represented By
DANIEL JAMES THORNBURGH
Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz - Pensacola Fl
contact info
BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK
Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz - Pensacola Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, March 27, 2023
13 13 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/04 6:22 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A, B and C are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. Active-duty plaintiffs and non-veterans are hereby granted leave to file a motion to reopen their case which must be accompanied by a statement clarifying their status with respect to military service. Any motion to reopen on this basis must be filed on the individual docket for a plaintiff's case only by April 26, 2023. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/27/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 13, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 02/13 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK on behalf of RICHARD YORK (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 02/13 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK on behalf of RICHARD YORK (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 02/13 11:04 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT per PTO 17 against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, filed by RICHARD YORK. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
9 9 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 02/11 3:02 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 3/3/2022 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 02/11 2:55 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-00302. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Fri 02/11 9:33 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-142) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(kt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
6 6 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal,. (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/11/2022.]
Related: [-]
5 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Bryan F. Aylstock as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/11/2022.]
Related: [-]
4 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL Direct list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-302 (JRT/TNL). (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/11/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/11/2022.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/11/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9299493) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/11/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet