Knez Capital, LLC et al v. Epsilon Acquisition Services, LLC et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | T S Ellis, III |
Referred: | Theresa Carroll Buchanan |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00156 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 11, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 10, 2022 4:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
Epsilon Acquisition Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Kiel Brendan Brandt
|
|
Plaintiff
Knez Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Knez Group, LP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, June 06, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kiel Brendan Brandt (nneb) |
|
Tuesday, May 10, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal is GRANTED and this matter is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/10/2022. (nneb) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Knez Capital, LLC, Knez Group, LP(Houston, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() ORDERED that Plaintiffs immediately seek the entry of default from the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Rule 55(a), Fed. R. Civ. P. It is further ORDERED that, promptly after obtaining the entry of default, plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file a motion for default judgment against Defendants Epsilon Acquisition Services, LLC and Kiel Brendan Brandt and an accompanying memorandum; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs file a notice setting the hearing of the motion for default judgment against Defendants Epsilon Acquisition Services, LLC and Kiel Brendan Brandt for 10:00 a.m. on Friday, June 10, 2022, before the magistrate judge to whom this action is referred, and mail copies of the notice, motion, and memorandum to Defendants Epsilon Acquisition Services, LLC and Kiel Brendan Brandt at the defendants' last known addresses, certifying the same to the Court; and it is further ORDERED that this matter is REFERRED to the assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 for all further default proceedings and for preparation of a prompt report and recommendation (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/9/2022. (nneb)(c/s pursuant to Order) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Knez Capital, LLC, Knez Group, LP Kiel Brendan Brandt served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022 (Houston, Patrick) |
|
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Knez Capital, LLC, Knez Group, LP Epsilon Acquisition Services, LLC served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022 (Houston, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, April 12, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Donald Houston on behalf of Knez Capital, LLC, Knez Group, LP (Houston, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, February 17, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE by Knez Capital, LLC, Knez Group, LP re1 Complaint, Exhibits to Complaint(Amos, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Monday, February 14, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to Epsilon Acquisition Services, LLC, Kiel Brendan Brandt, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(nneb) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, February 11, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Proposed Summons re1 Complaint to Epsilon Acquisition Services, LLC by Knez Capital, LLC, Knez Group, LP. (Amos, David) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Proposed Summons re1 Complaint to K. Brendan Brandt by Knez Capital, LLC, Knez Group, LP. (Amos, David) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8242833.), filed by Knez Capital, LLC, Knez Group, LP.(Amos, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 02/14 11:14 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (nneb) |