California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:22-cv-00976
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2022
Terminated:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 10, 2022 1:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Fair Mobility Services, LLC
Represented By
Siavash Daniel Rashtian
Rashtian Law Group, Apc
contact info
Defendant
Fair Titling Trust
Represented By
Siavash Daniel Rashtian
Rashtian Law Group, Apc
contact info
Defendant
Miguel Angel Perez, Jr.
Represented By
Siavash Daniel Rashtian
Rashtian Law Group, Apc
contact info
Defendant
United States General Services Administration
Represented By
Wei Tai
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Bhagat Thind
Represented By
S Edmond El Dabe
El Dabe Ritter Trial Lawyers
contact info
Christopher K Dickson
Edabe Ritter Trial Lawyers
contact info
Jessica Lynn Castro
El Dabe Ritter Trial Lawyers
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, January 29, 2024
82 82 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/30 1:17 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL (DKT.81 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Based on a review of the Stipulation for Dismissal, sufficient good cause has been shown for the requested relief. Therefore, the Stipulation is APPROVED. The above-entitled action is dismissed with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
Related: [-]
81 81 stip Dismiss Case Mon 01/29 12:01 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41 filed by Plaintiff Bhagat Thind.(Dickson, Christopher)
Related: [-]