District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Amit P Mehta
Case #: 1:22-cv-00379
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2022
Terminated:Jul 18, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 10, 2022 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
CHRIS FISH
Represented By
R. Scott Oswald
The Employment Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Anita Mazumdar Chambers
The Employment Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Tejal Garg
The Employment Law Group
contact info
Defendant
JOO YOUNG LEE
Represented By
R. Scott Oswald
The Employment Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Anita Mazumdar Chambers
The Employment Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Tejal Garg
The Employment Law Group
contact info
Defendant
CASEY NEWELL
Represented By
R. Scott Oswald
The Employment Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Anita Mazumdar Chambers
The Employment Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Tejal Garg
The Employment Law Group
contact info
Defendant
JAKE PARDUHN
Represented By
R. Scott Oswald
The Employment Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Anita Mazumdar Chambers
The Employment Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Tejal Garg
The Employment Law Group
contact info
Defendant
SCOTT TOMINOVICH
Represented By
R. Scott Oswald
The Employment Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Anita Mazumdar Chambers
The Employment Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Tejal Garg
The Employment Law Group
contact info
Defendant
JESSICA VENABLE
Represented By
R. Scott Oswald
The Employment Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Anita Mazumdar Chambers
The Employment Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Tejal Garg
The Employment Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP
Represented By
Joel D. Bush
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Alexander McMillan Bullock
Kilpatrick Townsend Stockton, LLP
contact info
Kathleen Dodd Barton
Kilpatrick Stockton, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, July 18, 2022
37 37 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 07/18 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP (Bush, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
36 36 3 pgs misc Status Report Mon 07/11 11:57 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP. (Bush, Joel)
Related: [-]
order .Order Mon 07/11 6:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by July 25, 2022, updating the court on the status of settlement, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed by that date. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/11/2022. (lcapm1)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
35 35 misc Status Report Fri 06/17 4:26 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP. (Bush, Joel)
Related: [-]
order .Order Fri 06/17 4:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by July 11, 2022, updating the court on the status of settlement, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed by that date. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/17/2022. (lcapm1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 06/08 11:14 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 6/8/2022. Joint Status Report due by 6/17/2022. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
notice Notice of Hearing Fri 06/03 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference reset to 6/8/2022 at 11:00 AM (same date, new time) via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free access line: (877) 848-7030, access code: 321-8747. (zjd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 05/10 3:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 5/10/2022. Status Conference set for 6/8/2022 at 10:00 AM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free access line: (877) 848-7030, access code: 321-8747. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd) Modified access code on 5/10/2022 (zjd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2022
34 34 misc Transcript Thu 05/05 12:32 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on April 22, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-13. Date of Issuance: May 5, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/26/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2022.(wz)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 04/22 2:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 4/22/2022. Status Conference set for 5/10/2022 at 09:00 AM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free access line: (877) 848-7030, access code: 8384. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
33 33 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 04/20 4:24 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CHRIS FISH, JOO YOUNG LEE, CASEY NEWELL, JAKE PARDUHN, SCOTT TOMINOVICH, JESSICA VENABLE. (Chambers, Anita)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
32 32 respm Response to motion Wed 04/13 4:53 PM
RESPONSE re26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP. (Bush, Joel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
31 31 order .Order Fri 04/08 6:19 PM
ORDER referring this matter to the Mediation Program of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 8, 2022, which addresses: (a) the status of the mediation and settlement discussions; (b) whether the parties believe they would benefit from additional time for mediation and/or settlement discussions; and, (c) any other information that the parties believe the court should be aware of. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/8/2022. (lcapm1)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/11 8:59 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/8/2022 (zjch, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
30 30 respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 04/07 5:39 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re23 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP.(Bush, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
29 29 misc Transcript Thu 04/07 1:31 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on April 6, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-19. Date of Issuance: April 7, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/28/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2022.(wz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 04/18 1:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 4/6/2022. Status Conference set for 4/22/2022 at 2:00 PM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 04/05 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/6/2022 at 2:45 PM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free access line: (877) 848-7030, access code: 8384. (zjd)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
28 28 misc Status Report Fri 04/01 6:43 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP.(Bush, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Thursday, March 31, 2022
27 27 10 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 03/31 10:14 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re23 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by CHRIS FISH, JOO YOUNG LEE, CASEY NEWELL, JAKE PARDUHN, SCOTT TOMINOVICH, JESSICA VENABLE.(Garg, Tejal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
notice Notice of QC Thu 03/31 8:53 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR re26 Motion to Dismiss; emailed to tgarg@employmentlawgroup.com, cc'd 10 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI: DO NOT REFILE. Attorney signature must match login/password in future fillings. (zeg, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
26 26 motion Dismiss Wed 03/30 5:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by CHRIS FISH, JOO YOUNG LEE, CASEY NEWELL, JAKE PARDUHN, SCOTT TOMINOVICH, JESSICA VENABLE.(Garg, Tejal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Sunday, March 27, 2022
order .Order Sun 03/27 10:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by April 1, 2022, which updates the court on their efforts to negotiate a protocol agreement and to resolve this matter as a whole. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/27/2022. (lcapm1)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
25 25 misc Status Report Fri 03/25 8:13 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP.(Bush, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Thursday, March 24, 2022
24 24 misc Transcript Thu 03/24 5:00 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on March 18, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-96. Date of Issuance: March 24, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchase d from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/14/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2022.(wz)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
notice Notice of Hearing Fri 03/18 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: The Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 3/18/2022 at 3:30 PM will proceed in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
Related: [-]
minutes Evidentiary Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/18 5:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/18/2022. Joint Status Report due by 3/25/2022. (Plaintiff's Witnesses: Mark Eskridge and Cortney Watson; Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2022
23 23 motion Expedite Thu 03/17 5:43 PM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP.(Bullock, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 03/17 11:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting22 Consent Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/17/2022. (lcapm1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
22 22 motion Leave to File Document Tue 03/15 11:31 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by CHRIS FISH, JOO YOUNG LEE, CASEY NEWELL, JAKE PARDUHN, SCOTT TOMINOVICH, JESSICA VENABLE.(Chambers, Anita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A (Surreply and Exhibits)
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/15 4:36 PM
NOTICE re Plaintiff's Request to Permit Live Testimony During Preliminary Injunction Hearing by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP re Order,,, (Bullock, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
20 20 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 03/09 9:19 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP.(Bush, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summary about Identification and Return of Digital Media,
Att: 2 Declaration - Second Declaration of Cortney Watson,
Att: 3 Declaration - Second Declaration of Katherine White,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 to Second White Decl.,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 to Second White Decl.,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 to Second White Decl.,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 to Second White Decl.,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 to Second White Decl.,
Att: 9 Exhibit 6 to Second White Decl.,
Att: 10 Exhibit 7 to Second White Decl.,
Att: 11 Exhibit 8 to Second White Decl.,
Att: 12 Exhibit 9 to Second White Decl.,
Att: 13 Declaration Second Declaration of Amy Mansfield,
Att: 14 Exhibit 1 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 15 Exhibit 2 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 16 Exhibit 3 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 17 Exhibit 4 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 18 Exhibit 5 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 19 Exhibit 6 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 20 Exhibit 7 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 21 Exhibit 8 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 22 Exhibit 9 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 23 Exhibit 10 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 24 Exhibit 11 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 25 Exhibit 12 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 26 Exhibit 13 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 27 Exhibit 14 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 28 Exhibit 15 to Second Mansfield Decl.,
Att: 29 Exhibit 16 to Second Mansfield Decl.
Thursday, March 03, 2022
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/03 7:06 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by CHRIS FISH, JOO YOUNG LEE, CASEY NEWELL, JAKE PARDUHN, SCOTT TOMINOVICH, JESSICA VENABLE.(Chambers, Anita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/03 11:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before March 30, 2022. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/3/2022. (lcapm1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
18 18 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Wed 03/02 8:50 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by CHRIS FISH, JOO YOUNG LEE, CASEY NEWELL, JAKE PARDUHN, SCOTT TOMINOVICH, JESSICA VENABLE.(Chambers, Anita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Declaration,
Att: 8 Declaration,
Att: 9 Declaration,
Att: 10 Declaration,
Att: 11 Declaration,
Att: 12 Declaration,
Att: 13 Exhibit
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/02 5:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tejal Garg on behalf of All Defendants (Garg, Tejal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
16 16 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Tue 03/01 8:16 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRIS FISH served on 2/23/2022, answer due 3/16/2022; JOO YOUNG LEE served on 2/23/2022, answer due 3/16/2022; CASEY NEWELL served on 2/25/2022, answer due 3/18/2022; JAKE PARDUHN served on 2/23/2022, answer due 3/16/2022; SCOTT TOMINOVICH served on 2/23/2022, answer due 3/16/2022; JESSICA VENABLE served on 2/26/2022, answer due 3/19/2022 (Bush, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/22 1:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Dodd Barton on behalf of MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP (Barton, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/22 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joel D. Bush on behalf of MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP (Bush, Joel)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 20, 2022
13 13 order .Order Sun 02/20 11:22 PM
ORDER. By submitting different drafts of an agreement, the court understood the parties implicitly to have asked the court to resolve their dispute over its scope. Attached is a draft Standstill Agreement, which largely tracks that proposed by Defendants. However, the court has modified paragraphs 6 and 19 to make clear that records relating to Introduced Clients is covered by the Agreement. See the attached Standstill Agreement for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/20/2022. (lcapm1)
Related: [-]
order .Order Sun 02/20 11:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: (1) Defendants' Opposition to2 Plaintiff's Motion shall be due on or before March 2, 2022; (2) Plaintiff's Reply in further support of its motion shall be due on or before March 9, 2022; and (3) a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion is hereby scheduled for March 18, 2022, at 3:30 p.m. If either party wishes to present testimonial evidence at the hearing, they shall notify the court by March 16, 2022, and advise how many witnesses they intend to call and how long the expected testimony will last. The courtroom deputy will circulate call-in information. Members of the public may access the conference by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. The public access line will be muted and should be used by only non-participating parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/20/2022. (lcapm1)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/18 6:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by R. Scott Oswald on behalf of All Defendants (Oswald, R.)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/18 6:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Mazumdar Chambers on behalf of All Defendants (Chambers, Anita)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/18 3:51 PM
NOTICE re Parties' February 18, 2022 Joint Submission by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP re Scheduling Conference, Set Deadlines(Bullock, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
9 9 misc Transcript Wed 02/16 5:00 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on February 15, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-20. Date of Issuance: February 16, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or pu rchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022.(wz)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 02/16 4:33 PM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/16 6:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joel D. Bush is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/16/2022. (lcapm1)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/16 6:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kathleen B. Dodd Barton is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/16/2022. (lcapm1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 02/15 8:29 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 01:30 PM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free access line: (877) 848-7030, access code: 8384.(zjd)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/15 2:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Scheduling Conference held via videoconference on 2/15/2022. The parties shall file a proposed schedule by 2/18/2022. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/14 6:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathleen B. Dodd Barton, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9044021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP.(Bullock, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 - Declaration of Kathleen B. Dodd Barton,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/14 6:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joel D. Bush, II, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9043989. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP.(Bullock, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Joel D. Bush, II,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/14 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Filing Corrected Documents by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP(Bullock, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corrected Declaration of Amy Mansfield,
Att: 2 Plaintiff's Corrected Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities
4 4 misc Errata Mon 02/14 10:33 AM
ERRATA re Verified Complaint - LCvR 5.1(c) Compliant by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP. (Bullock, Alexander)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of QC- New Case Mon 02/14 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Complaint; emailed to abullock@kilpatricktownsend.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/14 4:17 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
3 3 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Fri 02/11 8:15 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP (Bullock, Alexander)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 02/11 8:13 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP.(Bullock, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Casey Hebert,
Att: 2 Declaration of Cortney Watson,
Att: 3 Declaration of Katherine White,
Att: 4 Declaration of Amy Mansfield,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2,
Att: 7 Exhibit 3,
Att: 8 Exhibit 4,
Att: 9 Exhibit 5,
Att: 10 Exhibit 6,
Att: 11 Exhibit 7,
Att: 12 Exhibit 8,
Att: 13 Exhibit 9,
Att: 14 Exhibit 10,
Att: 15 Exhibit 11,
Att: 16 Exhibit 12,
Att: 17 Exhibit 13,
Att: 18 Exhibit 14,
Att: 19 Exhibit 15,
Att: 20 Exhibit 16,
Att: 21 Exhibit 17,
Att: 22 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 44 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/11 7:55 PM
COMPLAINT against MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9040977) filed by MCALLISTER & QUINN, LLP.(Bullock, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A - Venable Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Tominovich Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Fish Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Lee Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Newell Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Parduhn Agreement,
Att: 7 Summons (Venable),
Att: 8 Summons (Tominovich),
Att: 9 Summons (Fish),
Att: 10 Summons (Lee),
Att: 11 Summons (Newell),
Att: 12 Summons (Parduhn),
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet