Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-00023
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Feb 12, 2022 2:22 AM EST
Defendant
LaTia Monique Tucker (1)
Represented By
John C. Kiyonaga
The Law Office Of John C Kiyonaga
contact info
Shannon Quill
Office Of The Federal Public Defender (alexandria)
contact info
Jonathan Rhayader Oates
Krum, Gergely & Oates, LLC
contact info
Michael Christopher Sprano
The Sprano Law Firm LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael Phillip Ben'Ary
Us Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info
Bibeane Metsch
Us Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/12/2022 3:08 AM EST
Monday, September 13, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to LaTia Monique Tucker (1), Leon Edward Jackson (2). (shea) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/13/2021) (shea, ). [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT in Support re1 Complaint by USA as to LaTia Monique Tucker, Leon Edward Jackson (shea) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/13/2021) (shea, ). [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
4 4 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (shea) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to LaTia Monique Tucker and Leon Edward Jackson. (shea) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION to Seal by USA as to LaTia Monique Tucker and Leon Edward Jackson. (shea) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER granting6 Motion to Seal as to LaTia Monique Tucker (1), Leon Edward Jackson (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 9/13/2021. (shea) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
Arrest of LaTia Monique Tucker (lgue, ) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Oral ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to LaTia Monique Tucker - Shannon Quill for LaTia Monique Tucker appointed. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 9/17/2021. (lgue, ) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Initial Appearance as to LaTia Monique Tucker held on 9/17/2021. US appeared through: Colin Norton. Deft appeared without counsel. Deft informed of rights, charges, and penalties. Court to appoint counsel(FPD). Gov't is seeking detention - GRANTED pending PH/DH. Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 9/21/2021 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Deft remanded.(Tape #FTR.)(lgue, ) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
9 9 Temporary Detention Order as to LaTia Monique Tucker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 9/17/2021. (lgue, ) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
10 10 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 9/17/2021 in case as to LaTia Monique Tucker. (shea) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
CJA 20 as to LaTia Monique Tucker :Appointment of Attorney Michael Christopher Sprano for LaTia Monique Tucker (shea) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 09/21/2021 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff for defendant Tia TERMINATED to be set at a later date (per MSN Chambers) (lcre, ) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Amended CJA 20 as to LaTia Monique Tucker :Appointment of Attorney John C. Kiyonaga for LaTia Monique Tucker (shea) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Reset Hearings as to LaTia Monique Tucker: Detention Hearing reset for 9/22/2021 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Preliminary Hearing reset for 9/22/2021 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (lcre, ) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Shannon Quill. by LaTia Monique Tucker.(lcre, ) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 ORDER granting11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ORDERED that the Office of the Federal Public Defender be and hereby is relieved of further representation of the Defendant in this case. ORDERED that counsel be appointed to represent the Defendant in connection with the above-styled matter. Shannon Quill withdrawn from case. as to LaTia Monique Tucker (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 9/20/2021. (lcre, )(c/s) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
Reset Hearings as to LaTia Monique Tucker: Detention Hearing reset for 9/23/2021 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Preliminary Hearing reset for 9/23/2021 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (lcre, ) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff:Preliminary Hearing as to LaTia Monique Tucker held on 9/23/2021. US appeared through Michael Ben'Ary. Deft appeared with counsel Jon Kiyonaga. Govt adduced evidence and rests. Affidavit entered into evidence as Govt's exhibit no.1. Court finds PC. Matter continued for further proceedings before the Grand Jury. Detention Hearing as to LaTia Monique Tucker held on 9/23/2021. Govt does not contest detention. Deft placed on PR bond with conditions. Deft is REMANDED to the custody of the USMS until all conditions are met. (Tape #FTR.)(lcre, ) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to LaTia Monique Tucker (1) PR bond with conditions entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 9/23/2021. (lcre, ) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
15 15 PR Bond Entered as to LaTia Monique Tucker (wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
16 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to LaTia Monique Tucker.(shea) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/13/2021) (shea, ). [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Indictment as to LaTia Monique Tucker (1). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/13/2021. (c/m&s 10/13/2021 shea) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
19 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan R. Oates appearing for LaTia Monique Tucker. (shea) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
20 20 Order to Unseal Case filed by USA in open court is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 11/2/21. (tfitz, ) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
31 31 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to LaTia Monique Tucker.(Metsch, Bibeane) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
32 32 ORDERED that the time period for indicting the defendant be and is hereby extended up to and including January 20,2022. Accordingly, the delay resulting from the pending motion for extension shall be excluded in computing the time within which an indictment must be filed as to LaTia Monnique Tucker. No further extension will be granted. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/15/2021. (shea) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
33 33 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to LaTia Monique Tucker, Leon Edward Jackson.(Metsch, Bibeane) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
34 34 Protective Order as to LaTia Monique Tucker and Leon Edward Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/15/2021. (shea) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
36 36 MOTION to Substitute Attorney John Kiyonaga by LaTia Monique Tucker as to LaTia Monique Tucker, Leon Edward Jackson.(Oates, Jonathan) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
37 37 ORDER granting36 MOTION to Substitute Attorney John Kiyonaga as to LaTia Monique Tucker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 11/17/2021. (shea) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 26, 2021
Case as to LaTia Monique Tucker Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Magistrate Judge Michael S. (MJ)Nachmanoff no longer assigned to the case. (jlan) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
38 38 First MOTION to Amend/Correct14 Order Setting Conditions of Release Residence and Custodian by LaTia Monique Tucker.(Oates, Jonathan) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
39 39 ORDER granting38 First MOTION to Amend/Correct as to LaTia Monique Tucker (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 12/22/2021. (shea) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
40 40 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to LaTia Monique Tucker.(Ben'Ary, Michael) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
43 43 ORDERED that the time period for indicting the defendant be and is hereby extended up to and including February 18, 2022. Accordingly, the delay resulting from the pending motion for extension shall be excluded in computing the time within which an indictment must be filed. No further extension will be granted. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/19/2022. (shea) [1:21-mj-00308-TCB]
Related: [-]