18
|
|
18
order
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 01/28 5:41 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between Plaintiff Maya Hayuk and Defendants Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC, 42West, LLC, Bill Young Productions, Inc., and Sara Bareilles, by and through their counsel, that this entire action, including the operative Complaint shall be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/28/2015) (kgo)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Note to Attorney - Document Referred to Judge for Approval
Wed 01/28 11:07 AM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Aaron Silverstein Document 17 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,, was referred to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for approval. (km)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Notice Regarding Deleted Document
Wed 01/28 5:41 PM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 18 STIPULATION. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kgo)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Mail Copyright Form (case terminated)
Wed 01/28 5:43 PM
Mailed notice to Register of Copyrights to report the termination of this action. (kgo)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 01/26 2:11 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) 42West, LLC, Sara Bareilles, Bill Young Productions, Inc., Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Maya Hayuk.(Silverstein, Aaron)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 12/09 10:01 AM
CONSENT SCHEDULING ORDER: No amendments to the pleadings will be permitted after 1/9/2015. No additional parties may be joined after 1/9/2015. All discovery, including any depositions of experts, shall be completed on or before 4/1/2015. Pretrial Order due by 5/5/2015. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/8/2014) (mro)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 11/17 2:35 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel that the time for defendants Sara Bareilles, Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC, 42West, LLC and Bill Young Productions, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint dated August 11, 2014 is hereby extended up to and including December 17, 2014. 42West, LLC answer due 12/17/2014; Sara Bareilles answer due 12/17/2014; Bill Young Productions, Inc. answer due 12/17/2014; Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC answer due 12/17/2014. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/14/2014) (mro)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
order
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
Wed 11/12 1:28 PM
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT AND EPIC RECORDS, INC.: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1(A)(i), Plaintiff Maya Hayuk, hereby dismisses this action, with prejudice, solely as to defendants Sony Music Entertainment and Epic Records, Inc. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/11/2014) (ama) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Note to Attorney - Document Referred to Judge for Approval
Mon 11/10 11:29 AM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Aaron Silverstein Document 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was referred to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for approval. (km)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 11/07 1:34 PM
DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Epic Records, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment. Document filed by Maya Hayuk. (Silverstein, Aaron) Modified on 11/10/2014 (km).
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 11/05 4:47 PM
ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel receiving this order shall promptly mail copies hereof to all other counsel of record or, in the case of parties for which no appearance has been made, to such parties. Counsel for all parties are directed to confer regarding an agreed scheduling order. If counsel are able to agree on a schedule and the agreed schedule calls for filing of the pretrial order not more than six (6) months from the date of this order, counsel shall sign and email a PDF of the proposed schedule to the Orders and Judgment Clerk within thirty (30) days from the date hereof by using the consent scheduling order form annexed for the Court's consideration. If such a consent order is not emailed to the Orders and Judgments Clerk within the time provided, a conference will be held on 12/09/14 at 2:30 pm in courtroom 21B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. (Initial Conference set for 12/9/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 21B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/5/2014) (mro) Modified on 11/6/2014 (mro).
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 09/19 11:39 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel that the time for defendants Sara Bareilles, Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC, 42West, LLC and Bill Young Productions, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint dated August 11, 2014 is hereby extended up to and including November 17, 2014. 42West, LLC answer due 11/17/2014; Bill Young Productions, Inc. answer due 11/17/2014; Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC answer due 11/17/2014. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/17/2014) (mro)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/19 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad David Rose on behalf of 42West, LLC, Sara Bareilles, Bill Young Productions, Inc., Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC. (Rose, Brad)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 09/17 4:56 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Sara Bareilles waiver sent on 9/17/2014, answer due 11/17/2014. Document filed by Maya Hayuk. (Silverstein, Aaron)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/17 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa M. Buckley on behalf of 42West, LLC, Sara Bareilles, Bill Young Productions, Inc., Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC. (Buckley, Lisa)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 09/16 4:26 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel that co-defendant Bill Young Productions, Inc.'s time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint dated August 11, 2014 is hereby extended up to and including September 30, 2014. Bill Young Productions, Inc. answer due 9/30/2014. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/16/2014) (mro)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
misc
Letter
Tue 09/16 7:20 AM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Aaron Y. Silverstein dated 09/16/2014 re: Enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time for Bill Young Productions, Inc. to Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Maya Hayuk.(Silverstein, Aaron)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint
|
5
|
|
5
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Tue 09/02 7:43 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Bill Young Productions, Inc. served on 8/27/2014, answer due 9/17/2014. Service was accepted by Mike McBath, CEO. Document filed by Maya Hayuk. (Silverstein, Aaron)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 08/28 2:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC served on 8/27/2014, answer due 9/17/2014. Service was accepted by Sue Rhea, Managing Agent. Document filed by Maya Hayuk. (Silverstein, Aaron)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 08/28 2:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. 42West, LLC served on 8/27/2014, answer due 9/17/2014. Service was accepted by Sue Rhea, Managing Agent. Document filed by Maya Hayuk. (Silverstein, Aaron)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jvs) (moh).
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT against 42West, LLC, Sara Bareilles, Bill Young Productions, Inc., Epic Records, Inc., Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1102861)Document filed by Maya Hayuk.(jvs) (moh).
Related: [-]
|
|
|
SUMMONS ISSUED as to 42West, LLC, Sara Bareilles, Bill Young Productions, Inc., Epic Records, Inc., Paradigm Talent Agency, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment. (jvs)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (jvs)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Case Designated ECF. (jvs)
Related: [-]
|