Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-10826

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:22-ap-01042
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dikla Unatin
Represented By
Dikla Unatin
contact info
Defendant
Dean Unatin
Represented By
Dean Unatin
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert A. Kors, Chapter 11 Trustee
Represented By
Richard Lee Wynne
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Kfir Gavrieli
Represented By
Richard Lee Wynne
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
189 189 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 03/21 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/21/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 188 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, March 20, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 03/20 3:20 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 08/12/2025 at 02:00 PM 255 E. Temple St.Courtroom 1539Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (ME2)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Robert A. Kors
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
188 188 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Wed 03/19 11:57 AM
Order Approving Stipulation For Extension Of Discovery Cutoff And Continuing The May 13, 2025 Status Conference (BNC-PDF) The status conference scheduled for May 13, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby continued to August 12, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. Related [+] Signed on 3/19/2025 (ME2)
Related: [-] 186
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
187 187 misc Notice of Lodgment Tue 03/18 3:26 PM
Notice of lodgment of Proposed Order Filed by Interested Party J. Michael Issa, The Post Effective Date Trustee Related [+]. (Libeu, Allison)
Related: [-] 186 Stipulation By J. Michael Issa, The Post Effective Date Trustee, Dikla Unatin and Filed by Interested Party J. Michael Issa, The Post Effective Date Trustee, Defendant Dikla Unatin filed by Defendant Dikla Unatin, Interested Party J. Michael Issa, The Post Effective Date Trustee
186 186 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 03/18 3:23 PM
Stipulation By J. Michael Issa, The Post Effective Date Trustee, Dikla Unatin and Filed by Interested Party J. Michael Issa, The Post Effective Date Trustee, Defendant Dikla Unatin (Libeu, Allison)
Related: [-]