Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Yvette Kane
Case #: 1:22-cv-00218
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause29:0201 Violation of Fair Labor Act of 1938
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2022
Terminated:Jun 09, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Aug 13, 2022 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Meadows at Gettysburg for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC
Defendant
Priority Healthcare Group, LLC
Plaintiff
Tiffany Giles
Represented By
Andrew R Olcese
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
Ari R. Karpf
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
Timothy S Seiler
Karpf, Karpf & Cerruti, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
14 14 misc Status Report Tue 07/26 10:38 AM
STATUS REPORT by Tiffany Giles. (Seiler, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (60 Day Settlement Order) Thu 06/09 1:56 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE - AND NOW, on this 9th day of June 2022, upon notice from counsel that the parties have reached a settlement of this matter (Doc. No. 12), IT IS ORDERED THAT this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice, to the right of either party, upon good cause shown, to reinstate the action within sixty (60) days if settlement is not consummated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties are directed to submit, within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order, a joint status report addressing whether the instant action should be dismissed with or without prejudice. Should the parties fail to submit a timely status report in accordance with this Order, the Court will deem the dismissal of this action to be with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/9/22. (dmn)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Letter Thu 06/09 11:58 AM
Letter from Timothy S. Seiler, Esq. respectfully requesting that the Court enter an Order dismissing this matter with prejudice . (Seiler, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
11 11 3 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Thu 05/26 9:00 AM
Order approving re10 Stipulation - Defendants time in which to answer the Complaint is extended for an additional thirty days until June 30, 2022. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/26/22. (dmn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
10 10 misc Stipulation Wed 05/25 2:50 PM
STIPULATION to Answer Complaint with Proposed Order by Meadows at Gettysburg for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC, Priority Healthcare Group, LLC. (Presley, Marla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
9 9 3 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Thu 04/07 9:44 AM
Order approving re8 Stipulation - Time in which to answer the Complaint is extended to May 31, 2022. See Stipulation for complete details. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/7/22. (dmn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
8 8 misc Stipulation Wed 04/06 3:44 PM
STIPULATION [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Answer by Meadows at Gettysburg for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC, Priority Healthcare Group, LLC. (Presley, Marla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/30 11:22 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Giles. Meadows at Gettysburg for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC served on 3/21/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (Karpf, Ari)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/30 11:20 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Tiffany Giles. Priority Healthcare Group, LLC waiver sent on 3/30/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (Karpf, Ari)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 03/02 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R Olcese on behalf of Tiffany Giles (Olcese, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 03/02 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Seiler on behalf of Tiffany Giles (Seiler, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
3 3 misc Letter Wed 02/16 8:16 AM
Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/16/22. (dmn)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 02/14 3:32 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ibr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/14 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5848287), filed by Tiffany Giles. (ibr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet