New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:22-cv-01247
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331ed Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2022
Terminated:Oct 24, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Aug 13, 2022 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Aptdeco, Inc.
300 West 57th Street 33rd Floor
New York, NY 10019
Defendant
Kalam Dennis
Defendant
Reham Fagiri
Defendant
Jason Grant
Plaintiff
Jade Francis
Represented By
Paul Liggieri
L & D Law P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, October 24, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 10/24 3:41 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Courts calendar if the parties are unable to memorialize their settlement in writing and as long as the application to restore the action is made by November 24, 2022. If no such application is made by that date, todays dismissal of the action is with prejudice. See Muze, Inc. v. Digital On Demand, Inc., 356 F.3d 492, 494 n.1 (2d Cir. 2004). (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 10/24/2022) (tro)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs notice Notice of Settlement Mon 10/24 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Settlement in Principle Reached During Mediation Held on October 19, 2022 . Document filed by Aptdeco, Inc., Kalam Dennis, Reham Fagiri, Jason Grant..(D'Andrea, Theresa)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Fri 09/23 10:45 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 09/21 1:38 PM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The Initial Pretrial Conference is adjourned to November 1, 2022 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18C of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. The parties are directed to file a Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order and joint letter one week prior to that date. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/1/2022 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 9/21/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 09/21 1:12 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for October 4, 2022 addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Theresa D'Andrea dated September 21, 2022. Document filed by Aptdeco, Inc., Kalam Dennis, Reham Fagiri, Jason Grant..(D'Andrea, Theresa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Wed 08/24 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 9/23/2022.(ah)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
15 15 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Tue 08/16 10:08 AM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/25/2022. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (jpt)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 08/15 5:22 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/4/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 8/15/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/15 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Brian Lichtenberg on behalf of Aptdeco, Inc., Kalam Dennis, Reham Fagiri, Jason Grant..(Lichtenberg, David)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/15 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theresa Jeanine D'Andrea on behalf of Aptdeco, Inc., Kalam Dennis, Reham Fagiri, Jason Grant..(D'Andrea, Theresa)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/15 4:40 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Aptdeco, Inc., Kalam Dennis, Reham Fagiri, Jason Grant..(D'Andrea, Theresa)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/15 4:37 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Aptdeco, Inc., Kalam Dennis, Reham Fagiri, Jason Grant..(D'Andrea, Theresa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 06/21 2:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Aptdeco, Inc. waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022; Kalam Dennis waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022; Reham Fagiri waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022; Jason Grant waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Document filed by Jade Francis..(Liggieri, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 06/01 10:37 AM
ORDER granting7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to serve the individual defendants is extended to July 1, 2022. Absent exceptional circumstances, the Court will not grant another extension. SO ORDERED. Service due by 7/1/2022.. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 6/1/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
7 7 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/31 7:45 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Plaintiff's counsel on behalf of Plaintiff dated May 31, 2022. Document filed by Jade Francis..(Liggieri, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 05/17 12:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Aptdeco, Inc. served on 5/9/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan Authorized Agent of the Secretary of the State of NY. Document filed by Jade Francis..(Liggieri, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 05/17 10:54 AM
ORDER: A review of court records indicates that the complaint in this action was filed on February 14, 2022, and that no proof of service of the summons and complaint has been filed. Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure provides: If a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed, the court - on motion or on its own after notice to the plaintiff - must dismiss the action without prejudice against that defendant or order that service be made within a specified time. But if the plaintiff shows good cause for the failure, the court must extend the time for service for an appropriate period. The plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on the defendant on or before May 31, 2022. If service has not been made on or before May 31, 2022, and if plaintiff fails to show cause, in writing, why service has not been made, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. ( Service due by 5/31/2022.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/17/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/26 2:44 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aptdeco, Inc., Kalam Dennis, Reham Fagiri, Jason Grant. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/16 6:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Liggieri, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/15 2:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aptdeco Inc., Jason Grant, Kalam Dennis and Reham Fagiri, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jade Francis..(Liggieri, Paul)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/15 9:40 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Paul Liggieri. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 02/15 10:17 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 02/15 10:17 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 02/15 10:17 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/14 8:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Aptdeco, Inc., Kalam Dennis, Reham Fagiri, Jason Grant. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25731144)Document filed by Jade Francis..(Liggieri, Paul)
Related: [-]