Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-01528

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:D Sims Crawford
Case #: 2:22-ap-00010
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2022
Terminated:May 04, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
AF Title Co. Corp.
6775 Lenox Center Court #100
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
AF Title Co. Corp.
contact info
Plaintiff
Karl J. Vann Martin, II
10676 Highway 55 Lot 16
Sterrett, AL 35147
Represented By
Grafton Moore Weinacker
Bond, Botes, Reese & Shinn, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Saturday, May 06, 2023
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 05/06 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/06/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, May 04, 2023
28 28 court Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 05/04 8:10 AM
Clerks Notice of Dismissal and Closing of Adversary Proceeding (cdr)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/04 8:21 AM
Adversary Case 2:22-ap-10 Closed (cdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
27 27 court Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 05/02 4:15 PM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal By Karl J. Vann Martin IIand Between AF Title Co. Corp. Filed by Plaintiff Karl J. Vann Martin II Related [+] Complaint by Karl J. Vann Martin II against AF Title Co. Corp.. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 filed by Plaintiff Karl J. Vann Martin). (Weinacker, Grafton)
Related: [-] 1 14 (Recovery of money/property - other)
Friday, March 17, 2023
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 03/17 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 03/17/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order Rescheduling Hearing
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order Rescheduling Hearing Wed 03/15 8:11 AM
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #1; Status Conference on Complaint to Recover Money or Property. Hearing scheduled 05/03/2023 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham (stc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 02/16 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 02/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order Rescheduling Hearing
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
23 23 1 pgs order Order Rescheduling Hearing Tue 02/14 3:53 PM
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #1; Status Conference on Complaint to Recover Money or Property. Hearing scheduled 03/15/2023 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham (stc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 12/16 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 12/16/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order Rescheduling Hearing
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
21 21 1 pgs order Order Rescheduling Hearing Wed 12/14 9:50 AM
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #1; Status Conference on Complaint to Recover Money or Property. Hearing scheduled 02/15/2023 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham (stc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 12, 2022
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 11/12 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 11/12/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order Rescheduling Hearing
Thursday, November 10, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order Rescheduling Hearing Thu 11/10 3:02 PM
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 11/10/2022 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 12/14/2022 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (pbg)
Related: [-] 1 Status Conference on Complaint to Recover Money or Property filed by Plaintiff Karl J. Vann Martin
Friday, September 30, 2022
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 09/30 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order Rescheduling Hearing
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
17 17 1 pgs order Order Rescheduling Hearing Wed 09/28 12:31 PM
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 9/28/2022 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 11/2/2022 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (cdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karl J. Vann Martin
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/21 7:43 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant AF Title Co., Corp., dba American Financial. (Harrison, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Tue 08/30 10:40 AM
Certificate of Service Plaintiffs Consolidated Response to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents and Requests for Admission Related [+]. (Weinacker, Grafton)
Related: [-] 12 Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant AF Title Co., Corp., dba American Financial. filed by Defendant AF Title Co., Corp., dba American Financial
Sunday, August 28, 2022
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 08/28 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/28/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Rescheduling Hearing
Friday, August 26, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order Rescheduling Hearing Fri 08/26 11:01 AM
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #1; Status Conference on Complaint Complaint to Recover Money or Property. Hearing scheduled 09/21/2022 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham (stc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/18 7:59 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant AF Title Co., Corp., dba American Financial. (Harrison, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 22, 2022
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 05/22 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Pre-Trial Order
Friday, May 20, 2022
10 10 order Pre-Trial Order Fri 05/20 11:19 AM
Scheduling Order Signed on 5/20/2022 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/24/2022 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (jlp)
Related: [-] 1 Status Conference on Complaint Complaint to Recover Money or Property filed by Plaintiff Karl J. Vann Martin
Friday, April 22, 2022
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 04/22 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 04/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Rescheduling Hearing
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
8 8 1 pgs order Order Rescheduling Hearing Wed 04/20 9:14 AM
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #1; Pretrial Conference on Complaint to Recover Money or Property. Hearing scheduled 05/18/2022 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham (stc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 17, 2022
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 04/17 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 04/17/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Rescheduling Hearing
Friday, April 15, 2022
6 6 1 pgs order Order Rescheduling Hearing Fri 04/15 3:54 PM
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #1; Pretrial Conference on Complaint to Recover Money or Property. Hearing scheduled 04/27/2022 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham (stc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/15 10:37 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by AF Title Co., Corp., dba American Financial. (Harrison, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/15 1:04 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Complaint by Karl J. Vann Martin II against AF Title Co. Corp.. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 filed by Plaintiff Karl J. Vann Martin,3 Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/13/2022 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (klt)). (Weinacker, Grafton)
Related: [-] 1 14 (Recovery of money/property - other)1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karl J. Vann Martin
3 3 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 02/15 9:40 AM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/13/2022 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (klt)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karl J. Vann Martin
Monday, February 14, 2022
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 02/14 4:05 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/13/2022 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (klt)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karl J. Vann Martin
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/14 1:30 PM
14 Related [+]) Complaint by Karl J. Vann Martin II against AF Title Co. Corp.. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 (Weinacker, Grafton)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other