Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-01956
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2022
Terminated:Jul 08, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Aug 14, 2022 5:59 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
DUSTIN MICHEAL MCBROOM
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, July 08, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order Order Dismissing Case Fri 07/08 2:48 PM
ORDER granting 4 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/8/2022. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 07/06 2:56 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:4 MOTION to Dismiss (no response) (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
4 4 motion Dismiss Thu 06/16 10:42 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by DUSTIN MICHEAL MCBROOM. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/30/2022) . (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 02/15 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - Middle District of Alabama by DUSTIN MICHEAL MCBROOM (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/15 2:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/15 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6696673.), filed by DUSTIN MICHEAL MCBROOM. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]