Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-02050
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2022
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 16, 2022 5:55 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
2345 Rice Street Suite 230
Roseville, MN 55113
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
MICHAEL ULRICH
Represented By
PANAGIOTIS V ALBANIS
Morgan & Morgan Pa - Fort Myers Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 06, 2022
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/12 9:02 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (lsd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 02/17 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - Eastern District of North Carolina - Raleigh Division by MICHAEL ULRICH (ALBANIS, PANAGIOTIS)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/17 11:59 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ALBANIS, PANAGIOTIS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/17 11:58 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6704397.), filed by MICHAEL ULRICH. (ALBANIS, PANAGIOTIS)
Related: [-]