Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Malachy E Mannion
Case #: 3:22-cv-00235
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2022
Terminated:Jun 27, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 16, 2022 6:42 AM EDT
Defendant
John Edwards
Represented By
Connie Henderson
Siana Law, LLP
contact info
Sheryl L. Brown
Siana Law, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Steve Geist
Larksville Borough Employee (Attorney) 276 Overbrook Ave
Dallas, PA 18612
Represented By
Connie Henderson
Siana Law, LLP
contact info
Sheryl L. Brown
Siana Law, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Larksville Borough
Represented By
Connie Henderson
Siana Law, LLP
contact info
Sheryl L. Brown
Siana Law, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wayne Nichols
Represented By
Connie Henderson
Siana Law, LLP
contact info
Sheryl L. Brown
Siana Law, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Shelly
Represented By
Connie Henderson
Siana Law, LLP
contact info
Sheryl L. Brown
Siana Law, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Zomerfeld
220 Hill Lane
Larksville, PA 18651


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, June 27, 2022
28 28 3 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for More Definite Statement Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Report and Recommendations Mon 06/27 9:10 AM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting20 Motion for More Definite Statement; granting22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting26 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/27/22. (ep)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
27 27 misc Mail Returned Mon 06/13 11:42 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Christopher Zomerfeld containing Document 26 was returned,unable to forward. (ibr)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
26 26 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 06/03 8:58 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS RECOMMENDED that the defendants motion to dismiss and motion for more definite statement, (Docs.20 and22 ), be GRANTED and this case be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 6/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 3, 2022. (kjn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
order Verbal Order Reassigning Case Thu 06/02 3:59 PM
VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Malachy E Mannion and referred to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson for the filing of a Report and Recommendation. (jkc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
25 25 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/04 10:39 AM
ORDER - There is a motion to dismiss and motion for more definite statement pending in this case. (Docs.20 and22 ). the plf had not responded to this motion, and the time for responding had passed. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED as follows: The pltf is directed to respond to these motions on or before May 19, 2022. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.7 the movants may then file reply briefs on or before June 2, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 4, 2022. (kjn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
24 24 misc Exhibit Mon 04/25 10:52 AM
EXHIBITS A & B by Christopher Zomerfeld re1 Complaint. (ep)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
23 23 20 pgs respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Mon 04/18 3:38 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Edwards, Steve Geist, Larksville Borough, Wayne Nichols, Shelly.(Brown, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence
22 22 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/18 3:37 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John Edwards, Steve Geist, Larksville Borough, Wayne Nichols, Shelly.(Brown, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
21 21 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Mon 04/18 3:16 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re20 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by John Edwards, Steve Geist, Larksville Borough, Wayne Nichols, Shelly.(Brown, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion More Definite Statement Mon 04/18 3:14 PM
MOTION for More Definite Statement by John Edwards, Steve Geist, Larksville Borough, Wayne Nichols, Shelly.(Brown, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
19 19 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Tue 04/05 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Connie Henderson on behalf of Steve Geist (Henderson, Connie)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
18 18 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Mon 04/04 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sheryl L. Brown on behalf of Steve Geist (Brown, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
17 17 3 pgs misc Supplement Tue 03/29 2:48 PM
Supplement by Christopher Zomerfeld. to1 Complaint. (ep)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
16 16 misc Consent Form Sent (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) Fri 03/25 11:34 AM
CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Steve Geist, Christopher Zomerfeld YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 4/25/2022 (kjn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/23 11:03 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Steve Geist. Steve Geist waiver sent on 2/17/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (ep)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) - Do not use this event if this is a Notice of Appeal Wed 03/23 10:58 AM
NOTICE by Steve Geist of Appearance (Pro Se) (ep)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2022
13 13 1 pgs misc Consent Form Sent (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) Fri 03/04 4:05 PM
CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to John Edwards, Steve Geist, Larksville Borough, Wayne Nichols, Shelly, Christopher Zomerfeld YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 4/4/2022. (kjn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
12 12 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/02 2:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Shelly. (Brown, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/02 2:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Wayne Nichols. (Brown, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/02 2:45 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Larksville Borough. (Brown, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/02 2:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by John Edwards. (Brown, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 03/02 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Connie Henderson on behalf of John Edwards, Larksville Borough, Wayne Nichols, Shelly (Henderson, Connie)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 03/02 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sheryl L. Brown on behalf of John Edwards, Larksville Borough, Wayne Nichols, Shelly (Brown, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
6 6 11 pgs service Waiver of Service Forms Sent (AO 398 and 399) to Defendants Thu 02/17 4:44 PM
Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to John Edwards, Steve Geist, Larksville Borough, Wayne Nichols, Shelly. Waiver of Service due by 3/21/2022. (kjn)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Granting Application to Proceed IFP ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Directing Clerk's Office to Send Waiver of Service Forms Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/17 2:18 PM
Order Granting2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher Zomerfeld / ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on February 17, 2022. (kjn)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Standing Practice Order (Use Only in Non-Prisoner Pro Se Cases) Thu 02/17 12:53 PM
STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (ep)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Pro Se Letter issued - MJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Thu 02/17 12:51 PM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (ep)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/17 12:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Zomerfeld.(ep)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/17 12:33 PM
COMPLAINT against John Edwards, Steve Geist, Larksville Borough, Wayne Nichols, Shelly lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Christopher Zomerfeld.(ep)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet