Utah District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00055
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2022
Last checked: Friday Feb 18, 2022 12:28 AM MST
Defendant
Lehi Max Redcap Nephi (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Thaddeus J. May
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/18/2022 1:32 AM MST
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Lehi Max Redcap Nephi (1) count(s) 1. Assigned to Judge David Sam. (jrj) Modified on 2/16/2022-to fix name (jrj).
Related: [-]