New York Southern District Court
Judge:Denny Chin
Referred: Theodore H Katz
Case #: 1:08-cv-07104
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2008
Re-opened:Aug 21, 2013
Terminated:Mar 30, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Jun 16, 2016 4:16 AM EDT
ADR Provider
Sheldon Liebb
ADR Provider
Space Park AIM Partnership
ADR Provider
Amnon Cohen
Appellant
Timothy M. Holmes Revocable Trust, Larry Costa, Kristine Szabo, Stanley Simpson, Andrew Campbell, James D. Leckinger, Avraham Hochman, and Karen Polter
Represented By
Marc M LoPresti
Lederer Nojima Tagliaferro Lopresti & Blakely LLP
contact info
Appellant
Vivian Orgel
Applicant
Jerry B Klein
48 Wall Street 26th Floor
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
Gustav Peter Rech
Soffer, Rech & Borg, L.L.P.
contact info
Applicant
Badger Real Estate Advisors, LLC
707 Skokie Blvd Suite 580
Northbrook, IL 60062
Represented By
Steven Elliot Fox
Traub, Bonacquist & Fox, LLP
contact info
Claimant
Martin Malek
Represented By
Emily Sinclair Alexander
Thomas, Alexander & Forrester, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Memphis Dean, LLC
305 Broadway, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Jay B. Itkowitz
Itkowitz & Harwood
contact info
Creditor
TCF National Bank
Represented By
Charles J. Sullivan
Bond, Schoeneck & King, Pllc(syracuse)
contact info
Louis Orbach
Bond, Schoeneck & King, Pllc (rochester)
contact info
Amy Marie Culver
Bond, Schoeneck & King, Pllc (nyc)
contact info
Creditor
Key Equipment Finance Inc., a creditor of Wextrust Equity Partners, LLC
Albany, NY 12207
Represented By
Paul Arthur Levine
Lemery Greisler LLC
contact info
Creditor
First Tennessee Bank National Association
Represented By
John Peter Amato, Sr
Hahn & Hessen LLP
contact info
Clarence Andre Wilbon
Bass, Berry & Sims, P.L.C.(n'Vlle)
contact info
Stephen William Ragland
Bass, Berry & Sims, P.L.C.(memphis)
contact info
Creditor
Intervenor
Hinsdale Bank & Trust Co. 25 E. First Street
Hinsdale, IL 60521
Represented By
George R. Mesires
Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wextrust Securities, LLC
Represented By
John Philip Winsbro
Dickstein Shapiro Llp (nyc)
contact info
Randy Paar
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres, & Friedman LLP
contact info
Tamara Dawn Bruno
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wextrust Equity Partners, LLC
Represented By
John Philip Winsbro
Dickstein Shapiro Llp (nyc)
contact info
Randy Paar
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres, & Friedman LLP
contact info
Tamara Dawn Bruno
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wextrust Capital, LLC
Represented By
John Philip Winsbro
Dickstein Shapiro Llp (nyc)
contact info
Randy Paar
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres, & Friedman LLP
contact info
Tamara Dawn Bruno
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP
contact info
Carletta Flora Higginson
Jenner & Block Llp (nyc )
contact info
Stephen Louis Ascher
Jenner & Block Llp (nyc )
contact info
Defendant
Axela Hospitality, LLC
Represented By
John Philip Winsbro
Dickstein Shapiro Llp (nyc)
contact info
Randy Paar
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres, & Friedman LLP
contact info
Tamara Dawn Bruno
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP
contact info
Carletta Flora Higginson
Jenner & Block Llp (nyc )
contact info
Stephen Louis Ascher
Jenner & Block Llp (nyc )
contact info
Defendant
Wextrust Development Group, LLC
Represented By
John Philip Winsbro
Dickstein Shapiro Llp (nyc)
contact info
Randy Paar
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres, & Friedman LLP
contact info
Tamara Dawn Bruno
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP
contact info
Carletta Flora Higginson
Jenner & Block Llp (nyc )
contact info
Stephen Louis Ascher
Jenner & Block Llp (nyc )
contact info
Interested Party
Peck-Clarksville, LLC
Represented By
Michael Edward Lacy
Troutman Sanders Llp (va)
contact info
Brett David Goodman
Troutman Sanders Llp (nyc)
contact info
Interested Party
Avenue Bank
Represented By
Francesca Morris
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Interested Party
LNR PARTNERS, INC.
Represented By
Alexander Seton Lorenzo
Alston & Bird, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Interested Party
Ticor Title Insurance Company
Represented By
Francesca Morris
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Interested Party
MB FINANCIAL BANK M.A.
Represented By
Francesca Morris
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By
John Patrick Doherty
Alston & Bird, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Interested Party
B. David Peck
Represented By
Michael Edward Lacy
Troutman Sanders Llp (va)
contact info
Interested Party
International Consortium of Wextrust Creditors
Represented By
Martin S. Siegel
Brown Rudnick Llp (nyc)
contact info
Interested Party
International Ad-Hoc Committee of Wextrust Creditors
Represented By
Shalom Jacob
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Interested Party
Hilco Real Estate, LLC
Interested Party
Heritage Community Bank
Represented By
Francesca Morris
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Interested Party
FTI Consulting, Inc., Solely in its Capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Dewey & LeBoeuf Secured Lender Trust
570 Seventh Avenue, 17th Floor
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Tracy Lee Klestadt
Klestadt & Winters, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Erin Construction & Development Co., Inc.
Represented By
Michael Irwin Silverstein
Welby, Brady & Greenblatt, LLP
contact info
Adam William Downs
Welby, Brady & Greenblatt, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Space Park AIM Partnership
Represented By
Peter Bryan Katzman
Mazzeo Song & Bradham LLP
contact info
John Macleod Bradham
Mazzeo Song & Bradham LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Space Park ISSB Partnership
Represented By
Peter Bryan Katzman
Mazzeo Song & Bradham LLP
contact info
John Macleod Bradham
Mazzeo Song & Bradham LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Capital Bank N.A.
Represented By
Francesca Morris
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Sam J. McAllester, III
Bone Mcallester Norton PLLC
contact info
Michelle Theresa Hess
Holland & Knight Llp (ny)
contact info
Interested Party
Broadway Bank
Represented By
Andrew Todd Miltenberg
Nesenoff & Miltenberg, L.L.P.
contact info
James Bruce Daniels
Budd Larner Rosenbaum Greenberg & Sade, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Bank of America, N.A.
Meyner and Landis LLP One Gateway Center Suite 2500
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
David Bryan Grantz
Meyner And Landis, LLP
contact info
Intervenor
U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Commercial Mortgage Trust Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-C3, by i
Represented By
Todd Allen Gale
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Edward S. Weil
Dykema Gossett, PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Avrohom Shereshevsky
Represented By
John C. Meringolo
Meringolo & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Holmes Revocable Trust
45 Broadway Suite 2200
New York, NY 10006
Represented By
Marc M LoPresti
Lederer Nojima Tagliaferro Lopresti & Blakely LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP
Movant
Gerald Jaffe
Represented By
Elizabeth P. Gray
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Movant
Barrington, Bank & Trust Company, N.A
Represented By
Edward F. Malone
Barack, Ferrazzano, Kirschbaum & Nagelberg, L.L.P.
contact info
Movant
Lawrence Costa
P.O. Box 399
Nottingham, NH 03290
Represented By
Beth L. Kaufman
Schoeman Updike & Kaufman LLP
contact info
David B. Gordon
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp Llp (ny)
contact info
Movant
Hinsdale Bank & Trust Co.
Represented By
Edward F. Malone
Barack, Ferrazzano, Kirschbaum & Nagelberg, L.L.P.
contact info
Movant
Regions Bank
Represented By
Keith Nicholas Costa
contact info
John H. Rowland
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell, & Berkowitz, P.C.
contact info
Susan Florence Balaschak
Akerman LLP
contact info
Randal S. Mashburn
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz,p.C.
contact info
Objector
Southeast Warehouse Partners, LLC
Represented By
Alan Evan Marder
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C. (garden City)
contact info
Objector
G&H Partners, AG
Represented By
Joshua L. Solomon
Sullivan & Worcester Llp (ma)
contact info
Barry Shawn Pollack
Sullivan & Worcester Llp (ma)
contact info
Objector
RAIT Rogers Plaza, LLC
Morrison Cohen LLP 909 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Objector
RAIT Partnership, LP
Morrison Cohen LP 909 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Objector
Nashville Warehouse Partners, LLC
Represented By
Alan Evan Marder
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C. (garden City)
contact info
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By
Andrew Matthew Calamari
contact info
Danielle Sallah
Senior Attorney Enforcement Division
contact info
Neal Ralph Jacobson
contact info
Alexander Mircea Vasilescu
contact info
Steven G. Rawlings
Securities And Exchange Commission(nyc)
contact info
Receiver
Mr. Jonathan W. Ware
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP 700 13th St, NW
Washington, DC 20005
Represented By
Tyler S. Clarkson
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP
contact info
Jonathan W. Ware
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP
contact info
Receiver
Timothy J Coleman
Represented By
Mark S. Radke
Dewey & Leboeuf, Llp (dc)
contact info
Emily Barbara Holland
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer
contact info
Tamara Dawn Bruno
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP
contact info
Leo V. Gagion
Chapman & Cutler Llp ( New York)
contact info
John K. Warren
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP
contact info
Carletta Flora Higginson
Jenner & Block Llp (nyc )
contact info
Harvey Kurzweil
Dewey & Leboeuf, L.L.P.(nyc)
contact info
Stephen Louis Ascher
Jenner & Block Llp (nyc )
contact info
Vincent P. Schmeltz
Dewey & Leboeuf Llp(chicago)
contact info
George Peter Angelich
Arent Fox Llp(new York)
contact info
Ilona Beth Coleman-Lange
Dewey & Leboeuf LLP
contact info
Jonathan W. Ware
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP
contact info
John Philip Winsbro
Dickstein Shapiro Llp (nyc)
contact info
Randy Paar
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres, & Friedman LLP
contact info
Mia Lynne Havel
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer LLP
contact info
Timothy Joseph Coleman
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP
contact info
Kelly Anne Librera
Dewey & Leboeuf, L.L.P.(nyc)
contact info
Respondent
Michael Gorney
Represented By
Silvia L. Serpe
Serpe Ryan LLC
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Amnon Cohen
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Joseph Shereshevsky
Represented By
John C. Meringolo
Meringolo & Associates, P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Much Shelist Denenberg Ament & Rubenstein, P.C.
Represented By
Kristen E. Hudson
Schopf & Weiss LLP
contact info
Howard Steven Suskin
Jenner & Block Llp (chicago)
contact info
Paula Enid Litt
Schopf & Weiss
contact info
Carletta Flora Higginson
Jenner & Block Llp (nyc )
contact info
Stephen Louis Ascher
Jenner & Block Llp (nyc )
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Timothy J Coleman
Represented By
John Philip Winsbro
Dickstein Shapiro Llp (nyc)
contact info
Randy Paar
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres, & Friedman LLP
contact info
Tamara Dawn Bruno
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP
contact info
Mohsin N. Khambati
Dewey & Leboeuf LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Steven Byers
Terminated: 07/18/2014
Represented By
Barry S Zone
Moses & Singer LLP
contact info
Jason Canales
Gerstsen, Savage, Kaplowitz, Wolf, & Marcus, Llp(lex. Ave.)
contact info
Steven Richard Popofsky
Moses & Singer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Elka Shereshevsky
Terminated: 05/10/2013
Represented By
Michael Fred Bachner
Bachner & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Shereshevsky
Terminated: 08/08/2013
Represented By
John C. Meringolo
Meringolo & Associates, P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Westport Insurance Corporation
Terminated: 10/06/2011
Represented By
Robert P. Conlon
Walker Wilcox Matousek LLP
contact info
Christopher A Wadley
Walker Wilcox Matousek, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Terminated: 10/06/2011
Represented By
Charles F Morrissey
Karbal, Cohen, Economou, Silk & Dunne Llc.
contact info
Leor Joseph Kaplan
White And Williams LLP
contact info
Robert Wright
White And Williams Llp(nj)
contact info
Scott H. Casher
White And Williams LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, August 15, 2024
1198 1198 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/15 10:25 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Axela Hospitality, LLC, Wextrust Capital, LLC, Wextrust Development Group, LLC, Wextrust Equity Partners, LLC, Wextrust Securities, LLC. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Jacobson, Neal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/14 12:14 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Neal Ralph Jacobson. RE-FILE Document No. 1197 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): not all of the party/parties mentioned, whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
1197 1197 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 08/13 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Wextrust Capital, LLC. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Jacobson, Neal)
Related: [-]