New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:14-cv-00287
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2014
Terminated:Jan 23, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 17, 2015 11:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Gigliola Bertoglio
Defendant
Joyce Victoria Bigio
Defendant
Marco Brughera
Defendant
Laura Ferro
Defendant
Gentium S.p.A.
Defendant
Khalid Islam
Defendant
Jr. Bobby W. Sandage
Represented By
Joseph N. Sacca
Skadden, Arps, Slate,meagher & Flom Llp(iia)
contact info
Defendant
Elmar Schnee
Lead Plaintiff
Ajit Sodhi
Represented By
Juan Eneas Monteverde
Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Xavion Jyles
Represented By
A. Rick Atwood, Jr
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (san Diego)
contact info
Willie Charles Briscoe
The Briscoe Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
David T. Wissbroecker
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (san Diego)
contact info
Samuel Howard Rudman
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp(li)
contact info
David Avi Rosenfeld
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp(li)
contact info
William John Geddish
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Randall J. Baron
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (sandiego)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jazz Pharamaceuticals Italy S.r.l.
Terminated: 11/19/2014
Defendant
Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company
Terminated: 11/19/2014


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, January 23, 2015
32 32 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 01/23 4:57 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated January 22, 2015, Sandage's motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 1/23/2015)(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Right to Appeal,
Att: 2 Notice of Right to Appeal
Thursday, January 22, 2015
31 31 17 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 01/22 12:48 PM
OPINION AND ORDER re:20 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Bobby W. Sandage. For the foregoing reasons, Sandage's motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the motion at docket number 20 and to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/22/2015) (ama) Modified on 1/22/2015 (ama).
Related: [-]
misc Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk Thu 01/22 12:49 PM
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re:31 Memorandum & Opinion,, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (ama)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 19, 2014
30 30 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 11/19 7:22 PM
DECLARATION of Giuseppe Lombardi in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Bobby W. Sandage.(Sacca, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
29 29 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 11/19 7:19 PM
DECLARATION of Joseph N. Sacca in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Bobby W. Sandage.(Sacca, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 8,
Att: 2 Exhibit 9,
Att: 3 Exhibit 10
28 28 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 11/19 7:16 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Bobby W. Sandage. (Sacca, Joseph)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed Wed 11/19 5:57 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AGAINST JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY AND JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS ITALY S.R.L.: Notice is hereby given that pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses without prejudice all claims against JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY and JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS ITALY S.R.L. in the above-captioned action. This notice of dismissal is being filed with the Court before service by Defendants JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY and JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS ITALY S.R.L. of either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. SO ORDER BY THE COURT. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/19/2014) (ama)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 17, 2014
misc Note to Attorney - Document Referred to Judge for Approval Mon 11/17 10:31 AM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Juan Monteverde Document 26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was referred to Judge J. Paul Oetken for approval. (km)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 14, 2014
26 26 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 11/14 7:20 PM
DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Jazz Pharamaceuticals Italy S.r.l., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company. Document filed by Ajit Sodhi. (Monteverde, Juan) Modified on 11/17/2014 (km).
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 30, 2014
25 25 respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/30 4:24 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:20 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Ajit Sodhi. (Monteverde, Juan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 15, 2014
24 24 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 09/15 6:48 PM
DECLARATION of Salvatore Calabrese in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Bobby W. Sandage. (Sacca, Joseph)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 09/15 6:47 PM
DECLARATION of Guiseppe Lombardi in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Bobby W. Sandage.(Sacca, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
22 22 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 09/15 6:45 PM
DECLARATION of Joseph N. Sacca in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Bobby W. Sandage.(Sacca, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
21 21 respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 09/15 6:41 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Bobby W. Sandage. (Sacca, Joseph)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Dismiss Mon 09/15 6:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint . Document filed by Bobby W. Sandage.(Sacca, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 02, 2014
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/02 4:57 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Gigliola Bertoglio, Joyce Victoria Bigio, Marco Brughera, Laura Ferro, Gentium S.p.A., Khalid Islam, Jazz Pharamaceuticals Italy S.r.l., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Bobby W. Sandage, Elmar Schnee with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Ajit Sodhi. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by Xavion Jyles.(Monteverde, Juan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 25, 2014
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 08/25 3:36 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT AMENDED COMPLAINT. Notice to Attorney Juan Monteverde RE: Document No. 17 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong Filer was selected andPDF Error. Re-file the document and select the correct filer. Filer should be reflected in the caption of the amended complaint. (laq)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 22, 2014
18 18 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Fri 08/22 1:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to GENTIUM S.P.A., KHALID ISLAM, GIGLIOLA BERTOGLIO, LAURA FERRO, MARCO BRUGHERA, ELMAR SCHNEE, JOYCE VICTORIA BIGIO, re:17 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Ajit Sodhi. (Monteverde, Juan)
Related: [-]
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/22 1:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Gigliola Bertoglio, Joyce Victoria Bigio, Marco Brughera, Laura Ferro, Gentium S.p.A., Khalid Islam, Jazz Pharamaceuticals Italy S.r.l., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Bobby W. Sandage, Elmar Schnee with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Ajit Sodhi. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by Xavion Jyles.(Monteverde, Juan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 19, 2014
16 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned counsel for each of the parties hereto that: 1. Defendant Bobby W. Sandage, Jr. will answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before September 15, 2014. 2. Lead Plaintiff Ajit Sodhi will file and serve his opposition to Defendant Bobby W. Sandage, Jr.'s motion to dismiss, if any, on or before October 30, 2014. 3. Defendant Bobby W. Sandage, Jr. will file and serve his reply in further support of his motion to dismiss, if any, on or before November 20, 2014., ( Motions due by 9/15/2014., Responses due by 10/30/2014., Replies due by 11/20/2014.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/19/2014) (lmb)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines: Bobby W. Sandage answer due 9/15/2014. (lmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 22, 2014
15 15 ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to File Document. Lead Plaintiff Ajit Sodhi having moved for leave to file an Amended Complaint, and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED this 21 day of July, 2014, that Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is hereby GRANTED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/21/2014) (kgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 16, 2014
14 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . Document filed by Ajit Sodhi.(Monteverde, Juan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 09, 2014
13 13 ORDER GRANTING AJIT SODHI'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL: granting5 Motion to Appoint Ajit Sodhi as Lead Plaintiff(s); granting5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. This Court, having considered Ajit Sodhi's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel, and for GOOD CAUSE shown, hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 78u-4(a)(3)(B), Ajit Sodhi is appointed Lead Plaintiff for the putative class. 2. Lead Plaintiff's selection of counsel is approved. Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 78u-4(a)(3)(B)(v), the law firm of Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP is appointed Lead Counsel for the putative class. 3. Lead Counsel is vested by the Court with the following responsibilities and duties as further set forth in this order. 4. Lead Counsel shall make all work assignments in such a manner as to conduct the orderly and efficient prosecution of this litigation and to avoid duplicative or unproductive effort. 5. Defendants' counsel may rely upon all agreements made with Lead Counsel and such agreements shall be binding on all plaintiffs. 6. No motion, request for discovery, or other pretrial proceeding shall be initiated or served by any plaintiff except through Lead Counsel. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Docket Entry No. 5 (which is granted by this Order) and Docket Entry No. 8 (which has been withdrawn). (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/8/2014) (lmb) Modified on 5/12/2014 (lmb).
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2014
12 12 RESPONSE to Motion re:5 MOTION to Appoint Ajit Sodhi to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. ; Notice of Non-Opposition . Document filed by Xavion Jyles. (Rosenfeld, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re:5 MOTION to Appoint Ajit Sodhi to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel.. Document filed by Ajit Sodhi. (Monteverde, Juan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2014
10 10 DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re:8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint XAVION JYLES to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Xavion Jyles.(Rosenfeld, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certification,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Firm Resume
9 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint XAVION JYLES to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Xavion Jyles. (Rosenfeld, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel., MOTION to Appoint XAVION JYLES to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Xavion Jyles.(Rosenfeld, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
7 7 DECLARATION of JUAN E. MONTEVERDE in Support re:5 MOTION to Appoint Ajit Sodhi to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel.. Document filed by Ajit Sodhi.(Monteverde, Juan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J
6 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:5 MOTION to Appoint Ajit Sodhi to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel.. Document filed by Ajit Sodhi. (Monteverde, Juan)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Appoint Ajit Sodhi to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Document filed by Ajit Sodhi.(Monteverde, Juan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 05, 2014
4 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned counsel for each of the parties hereto that the time for Defendant Bobby W. Sandage, Jr. to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including thirty (30) days after entry of the Court's order appointing a lead plaintiff and approving that lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/5/2014) (lmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2014
3 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William John Geddish on behalf of Xavion Jyles. (Geddish, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2014
2 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (laq)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Gigliola Bertoglio, Joyce Victoria Bigio, Marco Brughera, Laura Ferro, Gentium S.p.A., Khalid Islam, Jazz Pharamaceuticals Italy S.r.l., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Bobby W. Sandage, Elmar Schnee. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1085575)Document filed by Xavion Jyles.(laq)
Related: [-]
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gigliola Bertoglio, Joyce Victoria Bigio, Marco Brughera, Laura Ferro, Gentium S.p.A., Khalid Islam, Jazz Pharamaceuticals Italy S.r.l., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Bobby W. Sandage, Elmar Schnee. (laq)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (laq)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (laq)
Related: [-]