Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-10362

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:22-ap-50139
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
David Hernandez
486 Cambridge Lane
Weston, FL 33326
Represented By
David Hernandez
contact info
Plaintiff
Advisory Trust Group, LLC, in its capacity as Trustee of the Creditors Trust of Hygea Holdings Corp.
Represented By
Howard A. Cohen
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, September 16, 2022
7 7 notice Adjourned Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Fri 09/16 10:33 AM
HEARING CANCELLED- Notice of Adjourned Hearing. The following original hearing has been adjourned. Filed by Advisory Trust Group, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 9/21/2022 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
6 6 misc Status Report Wed 08/10 4:32 PM
Status Report with Respect to Certain Adversary Matters Filed by Advisory Trust Group, LLC. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/11 5:11 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by David Hernandez Mediation due date: 08/9/2022. (Kasen, Jenny)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, March 10, 2022
4 4 cmp Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/10 6:48 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant David Hernandez. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] ument1
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 03/08 5:16 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant David Hernandez. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] ument1
Friday, February 18, 2022
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 02/18 1:31 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 22-50139 KBO] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10646991, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 02/18 9:50 AM
Adversary case 22-50139 Complaint by Advisory Trust Group, LLC against David Hernandez. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/19/2022. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A