Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-10362

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:22-ap-50149
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2022
Terminated:Jul 08, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lyne Connor
11400 NW 56th Drive Apt. 115
Coral Springs, FL 33076
Represented By
Lyne Connor
contact info
Plaintiff
Advisory Trust Group, LLC, in its capacity as Trustee of the Creditors Trust of Hygea Holdings Corp.
Represented By
Howard A. Cohen
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, July 08, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 07/08 10:59 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-50149 Closed (LBr)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 25, 2022
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/26 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 06/25/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, June 23, 2022
12 12 court VAN-433a Default Judgment - WITH Interest Thu 06/23 10:45 AM
Default Judgment against Lyne Connor Related [+] Tickle due by: 7/7/2022. Signed on 6/23/2022. (LBr)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
11 11 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Wed 06/22 7:56 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Against Lyne Connor Related [+] Filed by Advisory Trust Group, LLC. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] 7 7
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Default Judgment
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
10 10 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Tue 06/14 5:12 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference Filed by Advisory Trust Group, LLC, Advisory Trust Group, LLC,. Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2022 at 03:00 PM (check with court for location). (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/09 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 06/08/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, June 06, 2022
8 8 utility Corrective Entry Mon 06/06 10:05 AM
Corrective Entry ~ Entered in Error incorrect name Related [+] (LCN)
Related: [-] 6
Saturday, June 04, 2022
7 7 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Sat 06/04 10:42 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Lyne Connor Related [+] Signed on 6/4/2022. (LBr)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, June 03, 2022
6 6 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 06/03 10:27 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Connor Related [+] Signed on 6/3/2022. (LBr)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, June 02, 2022
5 5 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Thu 06/02 3:08 PM
Request for Entry of Default Against Lyne Connor Filed by Advisory Trust Group, LLC. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Entry of Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 10, 2022
4 4 cmp Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/10 6:54 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Lyne Connor. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] ument1
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 03/08 5:23 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Lyne Connor. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] ument1
Friday, February 18, 2022
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 02/18 1:31 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 22-50149 KBO] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10646991, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 02/18 10:22 AM
Adversary case 22-50149 Complaint by Advisory Trust Group, LLC against Lyne Connor. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/19/2022. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A