Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-10362

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:22-ap-50151
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2022
Terminated:Jun 22, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ronel Desrosiers
8810 Southwest 123rd Court Apt. M209
Miami, FL 33186
Represented By
Ronel Desrosiers
contact info
Plaintiff
Advisory Trust Group, LLC, in its capacity as Trustee of the Creditors Trust of Hygea Holdings Corp.
Represented By
Howard A. Cohen
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/22 8:27 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-50151 Closed (LBr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
6 6 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 06/21 6:00 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Advisory Trust Group, LLC (Slater, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
5 5 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Tue 06/14 5:12 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference Filed by Advisory Trust Group, LLC, Advisory Trust Group, LLC,. Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2022 at 03:00 PM (check with court for location). (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
4 4 cmp Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/10 6:57 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Ronel Desrosiers. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] ument1
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 03/08 5:34 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Ronel Desrosiers. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] ument1
Friday, February 18, 2022
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 02/18 1:31 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 22-50151 KBO] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10646991, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 02/18 10:25 AM
Adversary case 22-50151 Complaint by Advisory Trust Group, LLC against Ronel Desrosiers. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/19/2022. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A