Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-10362

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:22-ap-50153
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2022
Terminated:Aug 22, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Freire Santiago
115 S. Alhambra Circle
Coral Gables, FL 33146
Represented By
Freire Santiago
contact info
Plaintiff
Advisory Trust Group, LLC, in its capacity as Trustee of the Creditors Trust of Hygea Holdings Corp.
Represented By
Howard A. Cohen
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, August 22, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Mon 08/22 8:24 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-50153 Closed (LM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
9 9 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 08/19 3:43 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Advisory Trust Group, LLC (Slater, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
8 8 misc Status Report Wed 08/10 4:32 PM
Status Report with Respect to Certain Adversary Matters Filed by Advisory Trust Group, LLC. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
7 7 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Wed 07/20 3:03 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference Filed by Advisory Trust Group, LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
6 6 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Tue 06/14 5:12 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference Filed by Advisory Trust Group, LLC, Advisory Trust Group, LLC,. Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2022 at 03:00 PM (check with court for location). (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
5 5 cmp Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 04/05 2:30 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Santiago Freire. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] ument1
Thursday, March 10, 2022
4 4 cmp Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/10 6:59 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Santiago Freire. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] ument1
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 03/08 5:36 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Santiago Freire. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-] ument1
Friday, February 18, 2022
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 02/18 1:31 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 22-50153 KBO] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10646991, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 02/18 10:29 AM
Adversary case 22-50153 Complaint by Advisory Trust Group, LLC against Freire Santiago. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/19/2022. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A