Maryland District Court
Judge:Theodore D Chuang
Case #: 8:22-cv-00418
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Removal - Fair Debt Collection Practices Act
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2022
Terminated:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 17, 2022 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Yardi Systems, Inc.
430 South Fairview Avenue
Santa Barbara, CA 93117
Represented By
Paul Allan Solomon
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom
contact info
Raza Rasheed
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Michael Scott Bailey
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
John M Neukom
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Abraham A Tabaie
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
YES Energy Management, Inc.
Represented By
Paul Allan Solomon
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom
contact info
Raza Rasheed
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Michael Scott Bailey
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
John M Neukom
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Abraham A Tabaie
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Monica Sullivan
Represented By
Benjamin Howard Carney
Gordon, Wolf & Carney, Chtd
contact info

GPO Sep 30 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/30/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, January 31, 2025
81 81 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/31 12:45 PM
ORDER granting60 Motion for Settlement Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; granting61 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting62 Motion for Approval of Incentive Award to the Representative Plaintiff ; granting63 Motion to Approve Cy Pres Award. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/31/2025. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
80 80 9 pgs order Order Fri 01/31 12:34 PM
Final ORDER Approving Settlement and Certifying Settlement Class. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/31/2025. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
79 79 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 01/31 10:11 AM
Fairness Hearing held on 1/31/2025 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang re62 MOTION for Approval of Incentive Award to the Representative Plaintiff filed by Monica Sullivan, and63 MOTION to Approve Cy Pres Award filed by Monica Sullivan. (Court Reporter: Renee Ewing\2B) (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
78 78 misc Supplement Thu 01/30 11:59 AM
Supplement to60 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Monica Sullivan LINE SUBMITTING UPDATED PROPOSED FINAL ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS(Carney, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Updated Proposed Final Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Redline Version of Proposed Final Order