California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 8:22-cv-00268
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2022
Terminated:Jul 18, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 17, 2022 2:08 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Carolyn Marie Reed
Represented By
Jack M Rubin
Newmeyer And Dillion LLP
contact info
Michael B McClellan
Newmeyer And Dillion LLP
contact info
Zachariah R Tomlin
Cummins And White LLP
contact info
Michael W Shonafelt
Newmeyer And Dillion LLP
contact info
Larry M. Arnold
Cummins And White LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Gregory Ira Reed
Represented By
Jack M Rubin
Newmeyer And Dillion LLP
contact info
Michael B McClellan
Newmeyer And Dillion LLP
contact info
Zachariah R Tomlin
Cummins And White LLP
contact info
Michael W Shonafelt
Newmeyer And Dillion LLP
contact info
Larry M. Arnold
Cummins And White LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Ghassem Azadian
Represented By
John Scott Russo
Russo And Duckworth LLP
contact info
Robert E Bright
Law Office Of Robert Bright
contact info
Cross Claimant
SCC Structural Concrete
Represented By
John James Duffy
Gray Duffy LLP
contact info
Michael S Eisenbaum
Gray Duffy LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Roes
Defendant
City of Newport Beach
Represented By
Philip D Kohn
Rutan And Tucker LLP
contact info
Ajit Singh Thind
Rutan And Tucker LLP
contact info
Defendant
Legacy C D M Inc
Represented By
Charles L Harris
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Alexander Zachary Stepanek
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
Carolyn Marie Reed
Represented By
Zachariah R Tomlin
Cummins And White LLP
contact info
Larry M. Arnold
Cummins And White LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gregory Ira Reed
Represented By
Zachariah R Tomlin
Cummins And White LLP
contact info
Larry M. Arnold
Cummins And White LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Greenleaf Engineering
Represented By
Richard Gary Somes
Tyson And Mendes LLP
contact info
Defendant
SCC Structural Concrete
Represented By
John James Duffy
Gray Duffy LLP
contact info
Michael S Eisenbaum
Gray Duffy LLP
contact info
Gary S Gray
Gray Duffy, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ghassem Azadian
Represented By
John Scott Russo
Russo And Duckworth LLP
contact info
Robert E Bright
Law Office Of Robert Bright
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
56 56 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Tue 07/19 9:58 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court - Central Justice Center. Case number: 30-02021 01232738-CU-FR-WJC. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
55 55 order Remand Case to State Court Tue 07/19 9:56 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING Federal Claim With Prejudice and REMANDING Action to State Court by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiffs' second cause of action asserting a Section 1983 claim is DISMISSED with prejudice. This case was removed from state court on the basis of federal question jurisdiction. In the absence of a federal claim, the Court declines to exercise jurisdiction over the remaining state claims. Accordingly, the Court REMANDS the action to the Superior Court of California (County of Orange), Case No. 30-2021 01232738. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
54 54 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 07/15 3:17 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gary S Gray counsel for Defendant SCC Structural Concrete. Adding Michael S. Eisenbaum as counsel of record for SCC STRUCTURAL CONCRETE, a California corporation dba SCC CONSTRUCTION for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant SCC STRUCTURAL CONCRETE, a California corporation dba SCC CONSTRUCTION. (Gray, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
53 53 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/14 2:29 PM
Notice OF WAIVER OF WAIVER OF RIGHT TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; REQUEST TO IMMEDIATELY REMAND CASE TO SUPERIOR COURT filed by Plaintiff Ghassem Azadian(Trustee of the Ghassem (Gus) Azadian Living Trust, created March 6, 2012). (Russo, John)
Related: [-]
52 52 order Dismiss Thu 07/14 10:31 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING in Part Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc.17 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Defendants Motion is GRANTED in part. Plaintiffs Section 1983 claim is DISMISSED with leave to amend to cure the deficiencies identified in this Order if Plaintiff can do so consistent with his Rule 11 obligations. Plaintiff may not add claims or new defendants to the pleading. Any amended complaint shall be filed within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. If no timely amended complaint is filed, the federal claim will be dismissed with prejudice, and the action will be remanded to state court. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]