James Rigby v. Ryan Knott, et al
Original Case: 8:13-cv-01352
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:14-cv-56377 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 20, 2017 12:36 AM PST |
Defendant - Appellant
STANLEY M. GORDON, individually and as Trustee of The Gordon Family Trust Dated February 1, 2006
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
ELLEN D. GORDON, individually and as Trustee of The Gordon Family Trust Dated February 1, 2006
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
RYAN R. KNOTT, an individual
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
ASHLEY KNOTT, an individual
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-counter-claimant
CITIBANK, NA, a National Banking Association
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JAMES F. RIGBY, Chapter 7 Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 12:35 AM PST |