Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Judith E Levy
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 5:22-cv-10352
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 16, 2022 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant
NTVB Media Inc.
Represented By
Andrew M. Harris
Kitch, Drutchas, Wagner, Valitutti & Sherbrook,
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Russett
Represented By
Philip L. Fraietta
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Frank S. Hedin
Hedin Hall LLP
contact info
Sharon S. Almonrode
The Miller Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
E. Powell Miller
The Miller Law Firm
contact info
Gregory A. Mitchell
The Miller Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Ballard
Represented By
E. Powell Miller
The Miller Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Edward Briscoe
Represented By
E. Powell Miller
The Miller Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony DeBerry
Represented By
E. Powell Miller
The Miller Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Greg Donahoe
Represented By
E. Powell Miller
The Miller Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Gladys Waiters
Represented By
E. Powell Miller
The Miller Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Thursday, February 02, 2023
39 39 notice Notice - Other Thu 02/02 8:58 AM
NOTICE by Linda Ballard, Edward Briscoe, Anthony DeBerry, Greg Donahoe, Susan Vincenzo, Gladys Waiters re37 MOTION for Leave to File A Notice of Supplemental Authority , 38 Order on Motion for Leave to File (Miller, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1A - Carter v. DTN Mgmt. Co., --- N.W.2d ---, 2023 WL 439760 (Mich. Ct. App. Jan. 26, 2023)
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
37 37 motion Leave to File Wed 02/01 4:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to File A Notice of Supplemental Authority by Linda Ballard, Edward Briscoe, Anthony DeBerry, Greg Donahoe, Susan Vincenzo, Gladys Waiters. (Miller, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Notice of Supplemental Authority and 1A - Carter v. DTN Mgmt. Co.
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 02/01 6:22 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING37 Motion for Leave to File - Entered by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (CCie)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
36 36 notice Appearance Fri 01/06 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Baron on behalf of NTVB Media Inc.. (Baron, Steven)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Appearance Fri 01/06 4:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan John Healey on behalf of NTVB Media Inc.. (Healey, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Wed 12/14 12:11 PM
ORDER GRANTING31 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages - Entered by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (CCie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 12/13 4:50 PM
REPLY to Response re21 MOTION to Certify Question to the Michigan Supreme Court and Stay filed by NTVB Media Inc.. (Harris, Andrew)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 12/13 4:36 PM
REPLY to Response re20 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and (6) filed by NTVB Media Inc.. (Harris, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
31 31 motion File Excess Pages Tue 12/13 4:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by NTVB Media Inc.. (Harris, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
30 30 notice Hearing on Motion* Mon 11/28 1:29 PM
NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on20 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and (6) ,21 MOTION to Certify Question to the Michigan Supreme Court and Stay - Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2023 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman - (CCie)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 11/28 10:44 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages - Entered by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (CCie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
28 28 respm Response to Motion Tue 11/22 10:42 PM
RESPONSE to20 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and (6) filed by Linda Ballard, Edward Briscoe, Anthony DeBerry, Greg Donahoe, Susan Vincenzo, Gladys Waiters. (Miller, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Krassick v. Archaeological Inst. of Am., 2:21-cv-00180 (W.D. Mich. May 24, 2022) (defendants reply in support of motion to dismiss),
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Wheaton v. Apple Inc., Case No. 19-cv-02883, dkt. 51 (N.D. Cal. Sept. 20, 2019) (defendants reply in support of motion to dismiss)
27 27 motion File Excess Pages Tue 11/22 10:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ENLARGED BRIEF IN PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE BRIEF TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 20) by Linda Ballard, Edward Briscoe, Anthony DeBerry, Greg Donahoe, Susan Vincenzo, Gladys Waiters. (Miller, E.)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Response to Motion Tue 11/22 10:32 PM
RESPONSE to21 MOTION to Certify Question to the Michigan Supreme Court and Stay filed by Linda Ballard, Edward Briscoe, Anthony DeBerry, Greg Donahoe, Susan Vincenzo, Gladys Waiters. (Miller, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Hall v. Farm Journal, Inc., Case No. 21-cv-11811 (E.D. Mich. Apr. 5, 2022) (Lawson, J.), Tr. of Hrg. on Mot. to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Bozung v. Christianbook, LLC, No. 1:22-cv-00304 (W.D. Mich) (ECF Nos. 18-19) Defendants Mar. 31, 2022 Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support,
Att: 4 Exhibit C- Kochanski v. Am. City Bus. J., Inc., No. 1:22-cv-00582 (W.D. Mich. July 26, 2022) (ECF No. 12) Parties July 26, 2022 Joint Status Report,
Att: 5 Exhibit D- Kochanski v. Am. City Bus. J., Inc., No. 1:22-cv-00582 (W.D. Mich.) (ECF No. 12) Aug. 9, 2022 Order Staying Case,
Att: 6 Exhibit E- Edwards v. Hearst Communications, Inc., No. 15-cv-9279 (10/19/17 letter to court re spoliation),
Att: 7 Exhibit F- Deacon v. Pandora Media, Inc., No. 12-17734 (9th Cir. Feb. 19, 2015 Order)
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
25 25 notice Withdraw Motion Wed 11/02 12:01 PM
NOTICE by NTVB Media Inc. of withdrawal of17 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and (6) . (Harris, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
24 24 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Tue 11/01 12:30 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by NTVB Media Inc. (Harris, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
23 23 order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge* Mon 10/31 9:45 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman:20 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, and 21 MOTION to Certify Question to the Michigan Supreme Court and Stay. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
22 22 minutes ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Stipulation and Order Fri 10/28 2:23 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule re20 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, and 21 MOTION to Certify Question to the Michigan Supreme Court; Responses due by 11/22/2022, Replies due by 12/13/2022, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
21 21 motion Motion - Free Fri 10/21 4:25 PM
MOTION to Certify Question to the Michigan Supreme Court and Stay by NTVB Media Inc.. (Harris, Andrew)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Dismiss Fri 10/21 4:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and (6) by NTVB Media Inc.. (Harris, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Friday, October 07, 2022
19 19 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Fri 10/07 11:55 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Linda Ballard, Greg Donahoe, Edward Briscoe, Gladys Waiters, Anthony DeBerry, Susan Vincenzo against NTVB Media Inc.. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Miller, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - NTVB Media Entertainment Enhanced Masterfile Mailing List,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Privacy: Sales, Rentals of Videos, etc., House Legislative Analysis Section, H.B. No. 5331, Jan. 20, 1989,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - The Information Marketplace: Merging and Exchanging Consumer Data (Mar. 13, 2001),
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Webs Hot New Commodity: Privacy, WSJ (Feb. 28, 2011),
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Statement of FTC Commissioner Pamela Jones Harbour (Dec. 7, 2009),
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Martha C. White, Big Data Knows What Youre Doing Right Now, TIME.com (July 31, 2012),
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Natasha Singer, You for Sale: Mapping, and Sharing, the Consumer Genome, N.Y. Times (June 16, 2012),
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Letter from Senator John D. Rockefeller IV, Chairman, Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, to Scott E. Howe, Chief Executive Officer, Acxiom (Oct. 9, 2012),
Att: 10 Exhibit I - Bipartisan Group of Lawmakers Query Data Brokers About Practices Involving Consumers Personal Information, Website of Senator Ed Markey (July 24, 2012),
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Prize Scams, Federal Trade Commission,
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Charles Duhigg, Bilking the Elderly, With a Corporate Assist, N.Y. Times, May 20, 2007,
Att: 13 Exhibit L - Fraud Against Seniors: Hearing before the Senate Special Committee on Aging (August 10, 2000),
Att: 14 Exhibit M - 2014 TRUSTe US Consumer Confidence Privacy Report, TRUSTe,
Att: 15 Exhibit N - Joshua Brustein, Start-Ups Seek to Help Users Put a Price on Their Personal Data, N.Y. Times (Feb. 12, 2012),
Att: 16 Exhibit O - European Network and Information Security Agency, Study on monetising privacy (Feb. 27, 2012),
Att: 17 Exhibit P - Hann, et al., The Value of Online Information Privacy: An Empirical Investigation (Oct. 2003),
Att: 18 Exhibit Q - Californias Reader Privacy Act Signed into Law, Electronic Frontier Foundation (Oct. 3, 2011)
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
18 18 order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge* Wed 10/05 12:50 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman:17 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and (6) filed by NTVB Media Inc. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
17 17 motion Dismiss Mon 09/26 5:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and (6) by NTVB Media Inc.. (Harris, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
16 16 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/31 1:31 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Answer14 Second Amended Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 9/26/2022, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
15 15 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 08/12 1:15 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Extending Deadline to Answer re14 Amended Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 9/5/2022, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
14 14 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Thu 08/04 4:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Second Amended Class Action Complaint, Jury Trial Demanded filed by Gladys Waiters, Linda Ballard, Anthony DeBerry, Edward Briscoe, Greg Donahoe against NTVB Media Inc.. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Miller, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - NTVB Media Entertainment Enhanced Masterfile Mailing List,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Privacy: Sales, Rentals of Videos, etc., House Legislative Analysis Section, H.B. No. 5331, Jan. 20, 1989,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - The Information Marketplace: Merging and Exchanging Consumer Data (Mar. 13, 2001),
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Webs Hot New Commodity: Privacy, WSJ (Feb. 28, 2011),
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Statement of FTC Commissioner Pamela Jones Harbour (Dec. 7, 2009),
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Martha C. White, Big Data Knows What Youre Doing Right Now, TIME.com (July 31, 2012),
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Natasha Singer, You for Sale: Mapping, and Sharing, the Consumer Genome, N.Y. Times (June 16, 2012),
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Letter from Senator John D. Rockefeller IV, Chairman, Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, to Scott E. Howe, Chief Executive Officer, Acxiom (Oct. 9, 2012),
Att: 10 Exhibit I - Bipartisan Group of Lawmakers Query Data Brokers About Practices Involving Consumers Personal Information, Website of Senator Ed Markey (July 24, 2012),
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Prize Scams, Federal Trade Commission,
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Charles Duhigg, Bilking the Elderly, With a Corporate Assist, N.Y. Times, May 20, 2007,
Att: 13 Exhibit L - Fraud Against Seniors: Hearing before the Senate Special Committee on Aging (August 10, 2000),
Att: 14 Exhibit M - 2014 TRUSTe US Consumer Confidence Privacy Report, TRUSTe,
Att: 15 Exhibit N - Joshua Brustein, Start-Ups Seek to Help Users Put a Price on Their Personal Data, N.Y. Times (Feb. 12, 2012),
Att: 16 Exhibit O - European Network and Information Security Agency, Study on monetising privacy (Feb. 27, 2012),
Att: 17 Exhibit P - Hann, et al., The Value of Online Information Privacy: An Empirical Investigation (Oct. 2003),
Att: 18 Exhibit Q - Californias Reader Privacy Act Signed into Law, Electronic Frontier Foundation (Oct. 3, 2011)
Saturday, July 23, 2022
13 13 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Sat 07/23 2:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Edward Briscoe, Linda Ballard, Gladys Waiters, Anthony DeBerry against NTVB Media Inc.. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Miller, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-NTVB Media Entertainment Enhanced Masterfile Mailing List,
Att: 3 Exhibit B-Privacy: Sales, Rentals of Videos, etc., House Legislative Analysis Section, H.B. No. 5331, Jan. 20, 1989,
Att: 4 Exhibit C-The Information Marketplace: Merging and Exchanging Consumer Data (Mar. 13, 2001),
Att: 5 Exhibit D-Webs Hot New Commodity: Privacy, WSJ.com (Feb. 28, 2011),
Att: 6 Exhibit E-Statement of FTC Commissioner Pamela Jones Harbour (Dec. 7, 2009),
Att: 7 Exhibit F-Martha C. White, Big Data Knows What Youre Doing Right Now, TIME.com (July 31, 2012),
Att: 8 Exhibit G-Natasha Singer, You for Sale: Mapping, and Sharing, the Consumer Genome, N.Y. Times (June 16, 2012),
Att: 9 Exhibit H-Letter from Senator John D. Rockefeller IV, Chairman, Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, to Scott E. Howe, Chief Executive Officer, Acxiom (Oct. 9, 2012),
Att: 10 Exhibit I-Bipartisan Group of Lawmakers Query Data Brokers About Practices Involving Consumers Personal Information, Website of Senator Ed Markey (July 24, 2012),
Att: 11 Exhibit J-Prize Scams, Federal Trade Commission,
Att: 12 Exhibit K-Charles Duhigg, Bilking the Elderly, With a Corporate Assist, N.Y. Times, May 20, 2007,
Att: 13 Exhibit L-Fraud Against Seniors: Hearing before the Senate Special Committee on Aging (August 10, 2000),
Att: 14 Exhibit M-2014 TRUSTe US Consumer Confidence Privacy Report, TRUSTe,
Att: 15 Exhibit N-Joshua Brustein, Start-Ups Seek to Help Users Put a Price on Their Personal Data, N.Y. Times (Feb. 12, 2012),
Att: 16 Exhibit O-Tsai, Cranor, Acquisti, and Egelman, The Effect of Online Privacy Information on Purchasing Behavior, 22(2) Information Systems Research 254, 254 (2011),
Att: 17 Exhibit P-Hann, et al., The Value of Online Information Privacy: An Empirical Investigation (Oct. 2003),
Att: 18 Exhibit Q-Californias Reader Privacy Act Signed into Law, Electronic Frontier Foundation (Oct. 3, 2011)
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
12 12 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/06 11:40 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Answer1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 8/8/2022, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
11 11 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/02 1:45 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Answer1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 7/8/2022, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 29, 2022
10 10 notice Appearance Sun 05/29 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Frank S. Hedin on behalf of Elizabeth Russett. (Hedin, Frank)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
9 9 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/11 12:10 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Answer1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 6/8/2022, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
8 8 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/14 11:52 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Answer1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 5/18/2022, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
7 7 notice Appearance Wed 04/13 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Harris on behalf of NTVB Media Inc.. (Harris, Andrew)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Wed 04/13 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip L. Fraietta on behalf of Elizabeth Russett. (Fraietta, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
5 5 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/28 1:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. NTVB Media Inc. served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Almonrode, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
4 4 misc Attorney Appearance Thu 03/24 3:09 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory A. Mitchell appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued* Fri 02/18 3:47 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *NTVB Media Inc.* (DAll)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 02/18 3:49 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DAll)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
2 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sharon S. Almonrode appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Almonrode, Sharon)
Related: [-]
1 1 32 pgs COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against NTVB Media Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8799685 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: out of state - County Where Action Arose: out of state - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Miller, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - TV Guide mailing list,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Privacy: Sales, Rentals of Videos, etc., House Legislative Analysis Section, H.B. No. 5331, Jan. 20, 1989,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - The Information Marketplace: Merging and Exchanging Consumer Data (Mar. 13, 2001),
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Webs Hot New Commodity: Privacy, WSJ (Feb. 28, 2011),
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Statement of FTC Commissioner Pamela Jones Harbour (Dec. 7, 2009),
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Martha C. White, Big Data Knows What Youre Doing Right Now, TIME.com (July 31, 2012),
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Natasha Singer, You for Sale: Mapping, and Sharing, the Consumer Genome, N.Y. Times (June 16, 2012),
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Letter from Senator John D. Rockefeller IV, Chairman, Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, to Scott E. Howe, Chief Executive Officer, Acxiom (Oct. 9, 2012),
Att: 10 Exhibit I - Bipartisan Group of Lawmakers Query Data Brokers About Practices Involving Consumers Personal Information, Website of Senator Ed Markey (July 24, 2012),
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Prize Scams, Federal Trade Commission,
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Charles Duhigg, Bilking the Elderly, With a Corporate Assist, N.Y. Times, May 20, 2007,
Att: 13 Exhibit L - Fraud Against Seniors: Hearing before the Senate Special Committee on Aging (August 10, 2000),
Att: 14 Exhibit M - 2014 TRUSTe US Consumer Confidence Privacy Report, TRUSTe,
Att: 15 Exhibit N - Joshua Brustein, Start-Ups Seek to Help Users Put a Price on Their Personal Data, N.Y. Times (Feb. 12, 2012),
Att: 16 Exhibit O - Tsai, Cranor, Acquisti, and Egelman, The Effect of Online Privacy Information on Purchasing Behavior, 22(2) Information Systems Research 254, 254 (2011),
Att: 17 Exhibit P - Hann, et al., The Value of Online Information Privacy: An Empirical Investigation (Oct. 2003),
Att: 18 Exhibit Q - Californias Reader Privacy Act Signed into Law, Electronic Frontier Foundation (Oct. 3, 2011)