California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:22-bk-10293
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Apr 06, 2022

Debtor
R.A. Lotter Holdings, Inc.
6 Upper Newport Plz
Newport Beach, CA 92660-2629
Represented By
Summer M Shaw
Shaw & Hanover, PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Karen S Naylor (TR)
4343 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 300
Newport Beach, CA 92660
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 02/19/2022 12:01 AM PST
Friday, February 18, 2022
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 02/18 5:59 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:8:22-bk-10293] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A53958186. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 02/18 5:56 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by R.A. Lotter Holdings, Inc. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 03/4/2022. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 03/4/2022. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 03/4/2022. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 03/4/2022. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 03/4/2022. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 03/4/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 03/4/2022. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 03/4/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 03/4/2022. (Shaw, Summer)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Fri 02/18 7:05 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/6/2022 at 11:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]