Original Case: 1:21-cv-11455

First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-civil-01110
Typecivil / private / torts
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2022
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 5:10 AM EDT
Defendant
RICHARD E. WELCH, III, Superior Court Judge (Retired)
Represented By
Nicholas W. Rose
MA Attorney General's Office
contact info
Defendant
MASSACHUSETTS SUPREME JUDICIAL COURT
Represented By
Nicholas W. Rose
MA Attorney General's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PIERCE AND MANDELL, P.C.
Represented By
Peter H. Carroll
Sloane & Walsh LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LITCHFIELD CAVO, LLP
Represented By
Peter H. Carroll
Sloane & Walsh LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
AVERY DOOLEY AND NOONE, LLP
Represented By
Peter H. Carroll
Sloane & Walsh LLP
contact info
Interested Party - Appellant
GARY DOLAN
Represented By
Gary Dolan
contact info
Plaintiff
NELLIE SANINOCENCIO
Plaintiff - Appellant
NELLIE SANINOCENCIO
Represented By
Gary Dolan
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/01/2025 5:10 AM EDT
Friday, February 18, 2022
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #50) filed by Appellant Gary Dolan. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 03/04/2022. 22-1110 (JW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 29 pgs Abbreviated Record
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF