Original Case: 8:21-cv-02409

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv.pr-01162
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2022
Terminated:Feb 03, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 06, 2023 3:28 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
ANNE KORBEL ALBRIGHT
Represented By
Kevin Michael Cox
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MARYLAND
contact info
Kathryn Elizabeth Hummel
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MARYLAND
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HONORABLE MARY ELLEN BARBERA
Represented By
Kathryn Elizabeth Hummel
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MARYLAND
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STUART BERGER
Represented By
Kathryn Elizabeth Hummel
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MARYLAND
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NISHITH PATEL
Represented By
Nishith Patel
contact info

GPO Feb 03 2023
UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 8:21-cv-02409-GJH. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. Mailed to: Nishith Patel. [1001310053] [22-1162]

Docket last updated: 02/06/2023 3:25 AM EST
Friday, February 18, 2022
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:21-cv-02409-GJH. Case manager: RSewell. [1001113294] 22-1162 RHS [Entered: 02/18/2022 12:41 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. [1001113311] Informal Opening Brief due 03/14/2022 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 22-1162 RHS [Entered: 02/18/2022 12:53 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001113320]. Due: 03/04/2022. 22-1162 RHS [Entered: 02/18/2022 12:55 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION by Nishith Patel for injunctive relief pending appeal. Date and method of service: 02/18/2022 ecf. [1001113515] 22-1162 RHS [Entered: 02/18/2022 03:21 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 23 pgs MOTION
Att: 2 150 pgs Attachments
5 5 1 pgs NOTICE ISSUED to Anne Korbel Albright, Mary Ellen Barbera and Stuart Berger requesting response to Motion for injunctive relief pending appeal [4]Response due: 02/25/2022..[1001113546]. 22-1162 RHS [Entered: 02/18/2022 03:37 PM]
Related: [-]