New Jersey District Court
Judge:Renee Marie Bumb
Referred: Matthew J Skahill
Case #: 1:22-cv-00935
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2022
Re-opened:Apr 11, 2025
Terminated:Apr 11, 2025
Case in other court:Atlantic County Superior Court-Law Division, ATL-L-63-00021
Last checked: Sunday Aug 21, 2022 5:44 AM EDT
Defendant
HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By
CHARLES HOYT, III
Reilly, Mcdevitt & Henrich, P.C.
contact info
DAMIAN S. JACKSON
Reilly, Mcdevitt & Henrich, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOE 1-10
Defendant
JOHN DOE COMPANY 1-10
Plaintiff
EMILY ORBAY
49 MACKAY PLACE
BROOKLYN, NY 11209
Represented By
KENNETH FRANCIS PSOTA
contact info
Plaintiff Consolidated
PHILIP SARNER
2746 Oceanside Rd.
Oceanside, NY 11572
Represented By
KENNETH FRANCIS PSOTA
contact info

GPO May 16 2023
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Amend; ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint consistent with the foregoing in this Opinion by 5/26/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 5/16/2023. (dmr)
GPO Apr 11 2025
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 100 Motion for sanction; Directing Clerk's Office to reopen this case for the purpose of entering this opinion and order and to again administratively terminate this case, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 4/11/2025. (rss, )

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
111 111 misc Letter Thu 04/17 5:30 PM
Letter from Kenneth Psota, Esq.. (PSOTA, KENNETH)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
110 110 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Fri 04/11 4:43 PM
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's100 Motion for sanction; Directing Clerk's Office to reopen this case for the purpose of entering this opinion and order and to again administratively terminate this case, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 4/11/2025. (rss, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 04/11 4:45 PM
***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (rss, )
Related: [-]