Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Case #: 1:22-cv-00728
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1443(1)Removal from State Court - Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2022
Terminated:Apr 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 20, 2022 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Wade Damron
Represented By
Susan Elizabeth Teaster
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
James Charles Champlin, IV
contact info
Kathleen Mary Pacious
Office Of State Attorney General
contact info
Christopher Michael Carr
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Ronald Steve Boyter, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Georgia Department of Administrative Services
Represented By
Susan Elizabeth Teaster
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
James Charles Champlin, IV
contact info
Kathleen Mary Pacious
Office Of State Attorney General
contact info
Christopher Michael Carr
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Ronald Steve Boyter, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Georgia Department of Public Safety
Represented By
Susan Elizabeth Teaster
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
James Charles Champlin, IV
contact info
Kathleen Mary Pacious
Office Of State Attorney General
contact info
Christopher Michael Carr
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Ronald Steve Boyter, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Georgia State Patrol
Represented By
Susan Elizabeth Teaster
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
James Charles Champlin, IV
contact info
Kathleen Mary Pacious
Office Of State Attorney General
contact info
Christopher Michael Carr
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Ronald Steve Boyter, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-10
Defendant
Officer K.M. Wilkerson
Represented By
James Charles Champlin, IV
contact info
Defendant
Commissioner Col. Chris C. Wright
Represented By
Susan Elizabeth Teaster
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
James Charles Champlin, IV
contact info
Kathleen Mary Pacious
Office Of State Attorney General
contact info
Christopher Michael Carr
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Ronald Steve Boyter, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kandiace Patrice Toombs
Represented By
Brian Dion Granville
The Granville Group, LLC
contact info
Akil K. Secret
Secret Granville, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
34 34 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/23 10:09 AM
ORDER. The parties have indicated to the Court that the dismissal of this action with prejudice is not opposed. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/23/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 04/23 10:11 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/22 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Kandiace Patrice Toombs (Granville, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/01 3:01 PM
NOTICE by Wade Damron, Georgia Department of Administrative Services, Georgia Department of Public Safety, Georgia State Patrol, K.M. Wilkerson, Chris C. Wright OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA (Milton, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
31 31 misc Leave of Absence Tue 02/20 4:26 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26,. 27, 2024, by Shelley Milton. (Milton, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 12/29 12:28 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Defendants Wade Damron, Chris Wright, Kenneth Wilkerson, Georgia Department of Administrative Services (DOAS), Georgia Department of Public Safety (DPS), and Georgia State Patrol (GSP) having moved to substitute Shelley T. Milton, Assistant Attorney General, as their counsel of record in place of James Champlin, the motion is hereby granted, and Mr. Champlin shall be removed as counsel of record in this case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/29/2023. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
29 29 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 12/20 4:03 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney James C. Champlin, IVby Wade Damron, Georgia Department of Administrative Services, Georgia Department of Public Safety, Georgia State Patrol, K.M. Wilkerson, Chris C. Wright.(Milton, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, December 18, 2023
28 28 misc Leave of Absence Mon 12/18 5:16 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 12/22/2023 - 01/08/2024, 01/19/2024 - 01/26/2024, by Peter Andrew Lampros. (Lampros, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
27 27 order Scheduling Order Mon 09/25 8:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:26 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 5/6/2024. See document for further specifics. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/22/2023. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
26 26 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 09/22 11:16 AM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Kandiace Patrice Toombs. (Lampros, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 09/21 2:44 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF ABSENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED pursuant to LR 83.1(E)(4) that said20 Motion for Request for Leave of Absence for the period of September 8, 2023 through and including October 31, 2023, is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/21/2023. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Tue 09/19 10:51 AM
Clerk's Notation re21 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed and approved by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 09/08 3:54 PM
ORDER granting23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File the Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan through and including September 21, 2023.. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/8/2023. (dob)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time Fri 09/08 3:14 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File the Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan with Brief In Support by Kandiace Patrice Toombs. (Lampros, Peter)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/08 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Andrew Lampros on behalf of Kandiace Patrice Toombs (Lampros, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
21 21 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/07 12:17 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kandiace Patrice Toombs. (Granville, Brian)
Related: [-]
utility Docket Correction Thu 09/07 11:09 AM
Notification of Docket Correction re20 MOTION for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 8, 2023 through and including October 31, 2023, by Brian Dion Granville.(Granville, Brian) Modified on 9/7/2023 to edit event(tmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
20 20 misc Leave of Absence Wed 09/06 11:57 AM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 8, 2023 through and including October 31, 2023, by Brian Dion Granville.(Granville, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Request for Leave of Absence
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/29 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley Milton on behalf of Wade Damron, Georgia Department of Administrative Services, Georgia Department of Public Safety, Georgia State Patrol, K.M. Wilkerson, Chris C. Wright (Milton, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order Lifting Stay ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Mon 08/28 2:03 PM
ORDER: On March 29, 2022, the Court entered an order staying proceedings in this case until the criminal charges against Plaintiff were resolved in state court, and have ordered the parties to file reports as to the status of the criminal charges. Mar. 29, 2022, Order [Doc.5 ]. On August 22, 2023, Plaintiff filed a status report indicating that Plaintiff's criminal case "has been fully adjudicated and closed as of May 22, 2023." Pl. 's Status Report [Doc.17 ]. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan in accordance with Local Rule 16.2 of this Court no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff file a Certificate of Interested Persons in accordance with Local Rule 3.3 of this Court no later than ten (10) days from the of this Order. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/28/2023. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
17 17 misc Status Report Tue 08/22 5:12 PM
STATUS REPORT by Kandiace Patrice Toombs. (Granville, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
16 16 misc Status Report Tue 05/02 12:09 PM
STATUS REPORT Third by Wade Damron, Georgia Department of Administrative Services, Georgia Department of Public Safety, Georgia State Patrol, K.M. Wilkerson, Chris C. Wright. (Champlin, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/25 4:28 PM
ORDER: Leave of Absence has been requested by James Champlin, counsel of record for Defendants, for: 1) July 24th until and including September 4, 2023 for parental leave. The above and foregoing request for Leave of Absence is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/25/2023. (tmf)
Related: [-]
utility Docket Correction Tue 04/25 2:11 PM
Notification of Docket Correction re14 MOTION for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): From July 24 2023 to September 4, 2023, by James Charles Champlin, IV.(Champlin, James) Modified on 4/25/2023 to edit event(tmf). (tmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
14 14 misc Leave of Absence Mon 04/24 11:05 AM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): From July 24 2023 to September 4, 2023, by James Charles Champlin, IV.(Champlin, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
13 13 misc Status Report Wed 02/01 1:06 PM
STATUS REPORT THIRD by Wade Damron, Georgia Department of Administrative Services, Georgia Department of Public Safety, Georgia State Patrol, K.M. Wilkerson, Chris C. Wright. (Champlin, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
12 12 misc Status Report Fri 11/11 1:08 PM
STATUS REPORT by Kandiace Patrice Toombs. (Granville, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
11 11 misc Status Report Tue 11/01 4:19 PM
STATUS REPORT SECOND by Wade Damron, Georgia Department of Administrative Services, Georgia Department of Public Safety, Georgia State Patrol, K.M. Wilkerson, Chris C. Wright. (Champlin, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 10/21 3:14 PM
ORDER: On March 29, 2022, the Court entered an order staying proceedings in this case until the criminal charges against Plaintiff Toombs ("Toombs") are resolved, and ordered the parties to file a report as to the status of the criminal charges by July 1, 2022. Mar. 29, 2022, Order [Doc.4 ]. Both Toombs and Defendants filed their status reports indicating that they have not received further information about the status of Plaintiff's criminal case. The parties are DIRECTED to file another report as to the status of the Plaintiff's criminal case on November 1, 2022, and every ninety (90) days thereafter until the criminal prosecution is resolved. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/21/2022. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
9 9 misc Leave of Absence Wed 07/06 4:10 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): August 1, 2022, August 4, 5, 2022, August 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 2022, by James Charles Champlin, IV. (Champlin, James)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 07/06 2:32 PM
Submission of5 Order on Motion to Stay to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
8 8 misc Status Report Tue 07/05 7:35 AM
STATUS REPORT STATUS REPORT by Kandiace Patrice Toombs. (Granville, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
7 7 misc Status Report Fri 07/01 2:43 PM
STATUS REPORT by Wade Damron, Georgia Department of Administrative Services, Georgia Department of Public Safety, Georgia State Patrol, K.M. Wilkerson, Chris C. Wright. (Champlin, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
6 6 misc Leave of Absence Tue 06/07 5:22 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 07/05/2022, 07/06/2022, 07/07/2022, 07/08/2022, 07/15/2022, 09/16/2022, 09/17/2022, 09/18/2022, 09/19/2022, 09/20/2022, 09/21/2022, 09/22/2022, 09/23/2022, 09/24/2022, 09/25/2022, 09/26/2022, by James Charles Champlin, IV. (Champlin, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 03/29 2:46 PM
ORDER: This case comes before the Court on the Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Related Criminal Charges Against Plaintiff [Doc.4 ]. For good cause shown, this Court GRANTS the motion. The Court ORDERS this case is STAYED until the criminal charges are resolved against Plaintiff Toombs. The parties are DIRECTED to file a report as to the status of the criminal charges on July 1, 2022, unless they are resolved sooner. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/29/2022. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
4 4 motion Stay Wed 03/23 3:00 PM
MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Wade Damron, Georgia Department of Administrative Services, Georgia Department of Public Safety, Georgia State Patrol, K.M. Wilkerson, Chris C. Wright.(Champlin, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief In Support of Consent Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution Of Related Criminal Charges Against Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Exhibit Case Summary
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Wed 02/23 3:12 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/23/2022. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 21, 2022
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 02/23 10:04 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Wade Damron, Georgia Department of Administrative Services, Georgia Department of Public Safety, Georgia State Patrol, Chris C. Wright. Discovery ends on 7/21/2022. (Filed at the State Court of Fulton County).(ane)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 02/23 9:58 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Georgia Department of Administrative Services, Wade Damron, Georgia Department of Public Safety, Chris C. Wright, Georgia State Patrol. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11606146)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Documents,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 3 (2/23/2022) Corrected Civil Cover Sheet