MIE Holdings Corporation and Mei Liming
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 15 | |
Judge: | James L Garrity Jr |
Case #: | 1:22-bk-10216 |
Case Filed: | Feb 24, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2022 |
Debtor
MIE Holdings Corporation (In Provisional Liquidation) (For the Purposes of Presenting a Compromise or Arrangement to Creditors)
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Foreign Representative
Mei Liming
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago |
Monday, June 06, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Order signed on 6/6/2022 Closing Chapter 15 Case. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 06/06 3:17 PM
Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Wednesday, June 01, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Jason M. Pierce on behalf of Mei Liming. (Pierce, Jason) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Notice of Withdrawal of Docket Entry No. 15 filed by Kenneth Pasquale on behalf of Mei Liming. (Pasquale, Kenneth) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Notice of Presentment Notice of Final Report of the Foreign Representative and Presentment of Order Closing Chapter 15 Case filed by Kenneth Pasquale on behalf of Mei Liming. with presentment to be held on 5/26/2022 (check with court for location) Objections due by 5/23/2022, (Pasquale, Kenneth) |
|
misc
Terminate Pending Documents
Fri 04/22 4:41 PM
Pending "Motion, Closing Chapter 15 Case" Terminated per Doc # 17 . (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Motion for Order Closing Chapter 15 Case Notice of Final Report of the Foreign Representative and Presentment of Order Closing Chapter 15 Case [Objection Deadline: May 23, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. (prevailing Eastern Time); Presentment Date and Time: May 26, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. (prevailing Eastern Time] filed by Kenneth Pasquale on behalf of Mei Liming Objections due by 5/23/2022,. (Pasquale, Kenneth) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Order signed on 4/21/2022 Recognizing Foreign Proceeding. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Statement Notice of Change of Address [of Counsel] filed by Jason M. Pierce on behalf of Mei Liming. (Pierce, Jason) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Certificate of No Objection Regarding Verified Petition Filed by Jason M. Pierce on behalf of Mei Liming. (Pierce, Jason) |
|
Monday, April 04, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Jason M. Pierce on behalf of Mei Liming. (Pierce, Jason) |
|
Friday, April 01, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Declaration Supplemental Declaration of the Foreign Representative, Mei Liming, In Support of Verified Petition filed by Kenneth Pasquale on behalf of Mei Liming. (Pasquale, Kenneth) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Jason M. Pierce on behalf of Mei Liming. (Pierce, Jason) |
|
Friday, March 11, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Hearing Notice Of Filing And Hearing On Petition Seeking Recognition Of Foreign Proceeding And Related Relief Pursuant To Chapter 15 Of The United States Bankruptcy Code filed by Kenneth Pasquale on behalf of Mei Liming. with hearing to be held on 4/12/2022 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (JLG) Objections due by 4/5/2022, (Pasquale, Kenneth) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Order signed on 3/11/2022: (I) Scheduling a hearing on Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition and Related Relief and (II) Specifying form and manner of service and notice. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Jason M. Pierce on behalf of Mei Liming. (Pierce, Jason) |
|
Friday, February 25, 2022 | ||
misc
Add Judge
Fri 02/25 8:00 AM
Judge James L. Garrity, Jr. added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
Thursday, February 24, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Motion to Approve Application Of The Foreign Representative For Entry Of An Order (I) Scheduling A Hearing On Chapter 15 Petition For Recognition And Related Relief And (II) Specifying Form And Manner Of Service Of Notice filed by Kenneth Pasquale on behalf of Mei Liming. (Pasquale, Kenneth) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Declaration Of Peter Henry Kendall In Support Of Verified Petition Of The Foreign Representative For (I) Recognition Of The Cayman Proceeding As A Foreign Main Proceeding Or, In The Alternative, As A Foreign Nonmain Proceeding And (II) Certain Related Relief filed by Kenneth Pasquale on behalf of Mei Liming. (Pasquale, Kenneth) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Declaration Of The Foreign Representative, Mei Liming, In Support Of Verified Petition filed by Kenneth Pasquale on behalf of Mei Liming. (Pasquale, Kenneth) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Statement Verified Petition Of The Foreign Representative For (I) Recognition Of The Cayman Proceeding As A Foreign Main Proceeding Or, In The Alternative, As A Foreign Nonmain Proceeding And (II) Certain Related Relief filed by Kenneth Pasquale on behalf of Mei Liming. (Pasquale, Kenneth) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Kenneth Pasquale of Stroock Stroock & Lavan, LLP on behalf of MIE Holdings Corporation (In Provisional Liquidation) (For the Purposes of Presenting a Compromise or Arrangement to Creditors), Mei Liming. (Pasquale, Kenneth) |