California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: John E Mcdermott
Case #: 5:22-cv-00354
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2022
Terminated:May 20, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Aug 27, 2022 1:37 AM PDT
Defendant
Ruby J. Butchko
Represented By
Richard J Morin
Law Office Of Rick Morin, PC
contact info
Defendant
Steven Butchko
Represented By
Richard J Morin
Law Office Of Rick Morin, PC
contact info
Defendant
Dr Butchko
Represented By
Richard J Morin
Law Office Of Rick Morin, PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Sidney K Kanazawa
Represented By
Sidney Kanazawa
Sk Law Mediation
contact info
Plaintiff
Misael Romero
Represented By
Ross Cornell
Law Offices Of Ross Cornell Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Friday, May 27, 2022
30 30 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 05/27 7:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Misael Romero. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
29 29 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 05/20 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Misael Romero. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 05/20 3:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: On April 18, 2022, a Mediation Report was filed, which indicated that the parties had settled this matter (ECF No. 25). Accordingly, the Court ordered the parties to file a dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 by May 19, 202226 . To date, the parties have failed to file a timely dismissal.Instead, Plaintiff filed a Response requesting additional time to file a dismissal because "Defendants have not fully performed under the settlement agreement." The Court has no interest in monitoring parties' compliance with the terms of a settlement agreement. Given that the parties have settled the matter, this case should be dismissed. Any failure to satisfy the terms of the parties' settlement agreement, including payment, should be enforced in a subsequent lawsuit. The Court thus DENIES Plaintiff's request. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Response Fri 05/20 10:02 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Misael Romeroto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,26 (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
26 26 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/19 10:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:In light of the April 18, 2022 Mediation Report2 , which states that the parties have settled the matter, this action is placed on inactive status. By May 19, 2022, the parties shall file a dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of thisaction without further notice. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
25 25 adr Mediation Report (ADR-3) Not Held - Settled Mon 04/18 2:05 PM
MEDIATION REPORT filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Sidney K Kanazawa: A mediation did not take place because the case settled before the session occurred.(Kanazawa, Sidney)
Related: [-]
24 24 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Mon 04/18 7:41 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Sidney K Kanazawa has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
23 23 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Wed 04/13 11:43 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Sidney Kanazawa may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Misael Romero(Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
22 22 misc Statement Mon 03/28 3:40 PM
STATEMENT ADA Violations filed by Plaintiff Misael Romero re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22)20 . (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
21 21 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Thu 03/24 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)19 . Incorrect event Notice to Parties ADA disability Access Litigation, pdf document was the order grantingno. 18... Thus Order was redocketed as docket no. 20. (lc)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22) Thu 03/24 3:41 PM
ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: granting18 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to Dr Butchko; Ruby J. Butchko; Steven Butchko. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 6/22/2022. (lc)
Related: [-]
19 19 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Thu 03/24 2:53 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21) Thu 03/24 9:08 AM
APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendants Butchko, Ruby J. Butchko, Steven Butchko. (Attorney Richard J Morin added to party Butchko(pty:dft), Attorney Richard J Morin added to party Ruby J. Butchko(pty:dft), Attorney Richard J Morin added to party Steven Butchko(pty:dft)) (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
17 17 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 03/09 7:58 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Misael Romero, upon Defendant Ruby J. Butchko served on 3/5/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ruby J. Butchko in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 03/09 7:56 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Misael Romero, upon Defendant Steven Butchko served on 3/5/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steven Butchko by Ruby J. Butchko in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 03/09 7:52 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Misael Romero, upon Defendant Butchko served on 3/5/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dr Butchko, A California Veterinary Corporation in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
14 14 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 03/03 2:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Response13 ), to the Court's Order to Show Cause12 . The Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. (lc)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Response Thu 03/03 7:15 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Misael Romeroto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,12 (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/02 4:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than March 16, 2022 why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and any other state law claim asserted in the Complaint. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and other state law claims, if any, and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 02/28 3:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: ORDER REGARDING PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. The Court finds that there is good cause to institute a limited scheduling order concerning basic case prosecution for cases under the Americans With Disabilities Act involving physical barriers in places of public accommodation. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC ENUMERATED REQUIREMENTS AND DEADLINES THEREIN). The failure to comply with this Order in a particular case will result in a sanction of $300.00 payable to the clerk of the court within two weeks of Plaintiff being given notice of noncompliance and dismissal for lack of prosecution. The Court finds these sanctions sufficient and necessary to deter violations of the Order and to achieve timely prosecution of these cases without unnecessary intervention by the Court. (lc)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Mon 02/28 3:54 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 02/28 3:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) Modified on 2/28/2022 (lc)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 02/28 12:33 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Butchko, Ruby J. Butchko, Steven Butchko. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 02/28 12:19 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 02/28 12:19 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 02/28 12:18 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 26, 2022
4 4 notice Summons Request Sat 02/26 6:18 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Misael Romero. (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Sat 02/26 6:17 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Misael Romero, (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Sat 02/26 6:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Misael Romero. (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Sat 02/26 6:16 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32856488 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Misael Romero. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Misael Romero(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]