California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: John E Mcdermott
Case #: 2:22-cv-01361
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2022
Terminated:Mar 10, 2023
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 22STCV02395
Last checked: Saturday Aug 27, 2022 1:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Hollywood Park Management Company II, LLC
Represented By
Min Kyung Kim
Ford Harrison LLP
contact info
Daniel Chammas
Ford And Harrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hollywood Park Management Company, LLC
Represented By
Min Kyung Kim
Ford Harrison LLP
contact info
Daniel Chammas
Ford And Harrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Derek Hanna, Jr.
Represented By
Kane Moon
Moon And Yang Apc
contact info
Lilit Ter-Astvatsatryan
Moon And Yang Apc
contact info
Roy Karngwon Suh
Moon And Yang, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 31, 2023
27 27 misc Receipt Fri 03/31 11:52 AM
Receipt of remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court on 3/22/2023. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
26 26 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Mon 03/13 1:26 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, No.22STCV02395. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
25 25 order Compel Arbitration Stay Case Remand Case to State Court Mon 03/13 1:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Remand18 . Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration is MOOT9 . The court REMANDS this action to the Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case Number 22STCV02395. The Clerk of the Court shall administratively close the case. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
23 23 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 04/25 5:17 PM
Defendants' Objections to Late Filed Reply Brief [ECF No. 22] by Plaintiff Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court18 filed by Defendants Hollywood Park Management Company II, LLC, Hollywood Park Management Company, LLC. (Chammas, Daniel)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 04/25 1:28 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court18 filed by Plaintiff Derek Hanna, Jr.. (Suh, Roy)
Related: [-]
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 04/25 6:08 PM
TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING PLAINTIFF DEREK HANNA, JR.'S MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT (DKT.18 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court finds that the Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court currently scheduled for hearing on May 6, 2022,, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. The court expects the parties to continue litigating this action diligently, while awaiting the court's ruling on this motion. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
21 21 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 04/15 6:03 PM
Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand in support of opposition to motion to remand re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court18 filed by Defendants Hollywood Park Management Company II, LLC, Hollywood Park Management Company, LLC.(Chammas, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Chammas In Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Jason Gannon in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Janice Ide in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/05 9:56 AM
TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING DEFENDANT HOLLYWOOD PARK MANAGEMENT COMPANY II, HOLLYWOOD PARK MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION UNDER SUBMISSION (DKT.9 ) by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court finds that the Motion to Compel currently scheduled for hearing on April 8, 2022 is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. The court expects the parties to continue litigating this action diligently, while awaiting the court's ruling on this motion. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/04 6:51 PM
NOTICE Notice of Errata to ECF Docket No 12-1 Declaration of Derek Hanna Jr. in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay of All Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Derek Hanna, Jr..(Suh, Roy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Derek Hannah in Support of Plaintiff's Notice of Errata to ECF Docket No 12-1 Declaration of Derek Hanna Jr. in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay of All Proceedings
18 18 motion Remand Case to State Court Mon 04/04 6:20 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court Derek Hanna, Jr.. Motion set for hearing on 5/6/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Suh, Roy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Derek Hannah in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand,
Att: 2 Declaration of Roy K. Suh in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 03/29 12:03 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On March 25, 2022, Plaintiff Derek Hanna Jr. ("Plaintiff") filed a document captioned "Plaintiff's Unopposed Request and [Proposed] Order Vacating Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration Without Prejudice After Briefing and Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand," ("Request"). (Dkt.15 ). Contrary to Plaintiff's representation in the Request, Defendants Hollywood Park Management Company, LLC and Hollywood Park Management Company II, LLC ("Defendants") object to the Request. (Dkt.16 ). A request to the court must be made by motion, stipulation, ex parte application, or other means allowed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 7; Local Rules 7-1, 7-4, 7-19. Plaintiff did not comply with the procedural requirements to file a motion, stipulation, or ex parte application and does not cite any legal authority allowing him to bring the Request in the form presented. The court, therefore, STRIKES the Request (Dkt.15 ). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
16 16 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 03/28 10:20 AM
Objection to Plaintiff's Request Vacating Defendants' re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Arbitration 9 filed by Defendants Hollywood Park Management Company II, LLC, Hollywood Park Management Company, LLC.(Chammas, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Daniel Chammas
Friday, March 25, 2022
15 15 misc Statement Fri 03/25 7:52 PM
STATEMENT Plaintiffs Unopposed Request and [Proposed] Order Vacating Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration Without Prejudice After Briefing and Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Derek Hanna, Jr. re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Arbitration 9 .(Suh, Roy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Roy K. Suh in Support of Plaintiffs Unopposed Request and Proposed Order Vacating Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration Without Prejudice After Briefing and Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Vacating Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration Without Prejudice After Briefing and Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand
14 14 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 03/25 3:43 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Arbitration 9 filed by Defendants Hollywood Park Management Company II, LLC, Hollywood Park Management Company, LLC.(Chammas, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Daniel Chammas,
Att: 2 Declaration of Janice Ide [Supplemental]
Saturday, March 19, 2022
13 13 respm Declaration (Motion related) Sat 03/19 12:08 AM
DECLARATION of Roy K. Suh in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Arbitration 9 filed by Plaintiff Derek Hanna, Jr.. (Suh, Roy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
12 12 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 03/18 11:51 PM
PLAINTIFF DEREK HANNA JR.S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ALL PROCEEDINGS re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Arbitration 9 filed by Plaintiff Derek Hanna, Jr..(Suh, Roy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Derek Hannah
Thursday, March 10, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 03/10 3:35 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Roy Karngwon Suh counsel for Plaintiff Derek Hanna, Jr.. Lilit Ter-Astvatsatryan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Derek Hanna, Jr.. (Suh, Roy)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 03/10 3:24 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Roy Karngwon Suh counsel for Plaintiff Derek Hanna, Jr.. Adding Roy Karngwon Suh as counsel of record for Plaintiff Derek Hanna, Jr for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Derek Hanna, Jr.. (Attorney Roy Karngwon Suh added to party Derek Hanna, Jr.(pty:pla))(Suh, Roy)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
9 9 motion Compel Arbitration Stay Case Mon 03/07 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Arbitration filed by Defendants Hollywood Park Management Company II, LLC, Hollywood Park Management Company, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/8/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Chammas, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Min Kim,
Att: 2 Declaration of Janice Ide,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 03, 2022
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 03/03 11:13 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/02 9:24 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/02 9:24 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/02 9:23 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/28 2:59 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Hollywood Park Management Company II, LLC, Hollywood Park Management Company, LLC (Chammas, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Mon 02/28 2:58 PM
DECLARATION of Min K. Kim re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendants Hollywood Park Management Company II, LLC, Hollywood Park Management Company, LLC. (Chammas, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 02/28 2:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Hollywood Park Management Company II, LLC, Hollywood Park Management Company, LLC. (Chammas, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 02/28 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV02395 Receipt No: ACACDC-32862469 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Hollywood Park Management Company II, LLC, Hollywood Park Management Company, LLC. (Attorney Daniel Chammas added to party Hollywood Park Management Company II, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Chammas added to party Hollywood Park Management Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Chammas, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 30 pgs Summons & Complaint,
Att: 2 Proof of Service of Summons,
Att: 3 Proof of Service of Summons,
Att: 4 State Court Filings
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 03/02 9:26 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Hollywood Park Management Company II, LLC, Hollywood Park Management Company, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Derek Hanna, Jr. Filed in State Court on 1/20/2022 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal1 . (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 03/02 9:30 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Derek Hanna, Jr., upon Defendant Hollywood Park Management Company, LLC served on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Inc., Agent for Service of Process, by serving Jessie Gastelum, Intake Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 2/16/2022 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 03/02 9:33 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Derek Hanna, Jr., upon Defendant Hollywood Park Management Company II, LLC served on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Inc., Agent for Service of Process, by serving Jessie Gastelum, Intake Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 2/16/2022 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]