Morton v. D.R. Horton, Inc. et al
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey U Beaverstock |
Referred: | Katherine P Nelson |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00091 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 27, 2022 3:42 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bethel Engineering
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City Of Orange Beach Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
D.R. Horton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
D.R. Horton-Birmingham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Morton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trahan Aaron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Adams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Armstrong
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Ashton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Ashton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Josh Baker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Baldwin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clay Benjamin Barnhart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Barr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheyenne Beal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Beal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dedra Belcher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Bell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Bender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tena Bender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Blackwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Van Blake
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela L. Blauner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Blauner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Bogl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Bogl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Butler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crystal Butler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heineck Caitlyn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Liz Callaghan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Callaghan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adam Cooley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brent Allan Culwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Faith Culwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heidi Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taylor Debra
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
January Derrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christi Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelby Douglas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Duke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clayton Eames
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sara Pearl Fahrmann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ariel Haley Funderburg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Funderburg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Gahagan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Galloway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhonda Galloway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Gardner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean Garrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Gier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Gier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blake Hadley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Hadley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colin Hallford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sager J. Hamdan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Harper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roxanne Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Heath
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Lynn Hinote
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Hintz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Hodson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas Hoots
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Howard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Howard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judith Ann Jarman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth R. Jarman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jody W. Jaye
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jess Kalis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Kalis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gunderson Kelene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dalarain Kenny
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacie Kent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tim Kent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elisa Kessler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
McAnally Kevin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adams Kyle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlis Lairson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheri Lairson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman Laura
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heineck Logan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mills Lynn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Maddox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharron Mattison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Penny McAnally
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Geri Lynn McCane
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William McInvale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Ray Merriweather
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Merriweather
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Messer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Messer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cody Miles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Monroe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Morton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Mulvey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Loan M. Nguygen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Norman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald A. Orr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelia Orr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Ownes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terrie Ownes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Owsley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brent Parnell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Parnell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gahagan D. Patricia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nada Blamachan Permanand
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cecil Perry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Perry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricky Wilson Ramey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David P. Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paulette Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Miles Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Roberson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Herbert Roberson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hannis Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gunderson L. Romone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Lee Salas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Lee Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristi Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Settles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katelyn Sheppard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lance Cole Slater
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwin Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lindsey Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darbi Stanley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Stanley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rose K. Steven
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Strotman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Sullivan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rick Sullivan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lauren Sumrall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allie Marie Terrebonne-Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kirk Toth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Trahan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Vontroba
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathryn Wade
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mason Wade
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Wallace
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tad Wansely
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlton Washington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholos West
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Brandon Whaley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tara White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Wiger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Troy Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Wood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Wood
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Sara Winchester
Terminated: 08/25/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
178 | 178
![]() ORDER GRANTING174 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, as set out. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 04/30/2024. (cjr) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
177 | 177
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Franklin Hollis Eaton, Jr on behalf of Ashley N Adams, Kyle C. Adams, Barbara M Armstrong, Nada E Balbachan, Permanand Balbachan, Clay Lavaro Benjamin Barnhart, Michelle Renee Barr, Cheyenne A Beal, Angela Bell, John F Bender, William Camp Blackwell, Jacob Andrew Van Blake, Pamela L. Blauner, Robert A. Blauner, John D Bogle, Tiffany L Bogle, Christopher Anzy Butler, Crystal D Butler, Brent Allan Culwell, Stephanie Faith Culwell, Christopher H Davis, Christi J Dixon, Shelby Douglas, Betty Kathleen Duke, James Q Funderburg, Christopher A Gahagan, Edward Ray Galloway, Rhonda Ann Galloway, Richard Gardner, Michelle L Gier, Timothy G Gier, Blake S Hadley, Mary M Hadley, Colin Michael Hallford, David W Harrison, Roxanne S Harrison, Sarah A Harrison, Caitlyn Heineck, Logan V Heineck, Dan Hodson, Kelly Howard, Kevin W Howard, Derrick Lee January, Judith Ann Jarman, Kenneth Ray Jarman, Jess L Kalis, Kathy D Kalis, Dalarain F Kenny, Stacie C Kent, Timothy H Kent, Elisa Kessler, Carlis Lee Lairson, Jr, Sheri Lynn Lairson, Jerry Lee Maddox, Sharron Ann Mattison, William H McInvale, George F Messer, Jr, Kathleen Marie Messer, Cody R Miles, Victoria Miles, Lisa A. Morton, Michael A. Morton, Charles W. Mulvey, Sandra G Mulvey, Loan M. Nguygen, Laura Michelle Norman, Nathan Paul Norman, Ronald A. Orr, Shelia L Orr, Brent Parnell, Tammy D Parnell, Cecil W Perry, Nancy R Perry, Ricky W Ramey, David P. Reed, Paulette Reed, Steven K Rose, Kristi Rae Sanders, Katelyn E Sheppard, James Douglas Stewart, Melissa L Sullivan, Richard L Sullivan, Christopher James Taylor, Allie Marie Terrebonne, Kirk Toth, Kathryn Cummins Wade, Mason Alexander Wade, Tad Wansley, Arthur B Whaley, James M White, III, Tara L White, Jerry M Wood, Susan B Wood (Eaton, Franklin) |