Colorado District Court
Judge:Christine M Arguello
Referred: Kathryn A Starnella
Case #: 1:22-cv-00503
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Aug 27, 2022 6:13 AM MDT
Defendant
Kelly Bates
Represented By
Mary Barham Gray
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Holly Eileen Ortiz
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Cherry Creek School District No. 5
Represented By
Mary Barham Gray
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Holly Eileen Ortiz
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Anne Egan
Represented By
Mary Barham Gray
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Holly Eileen Ortiz
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Karen Fisher
Represented By
Mary Barham Gray
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Holly Eileen Ortiz
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Angela Garland
Represented By
Mary Barham Gray
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Holly Eileen Ortiz
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Janice McDonald
Represented By
Mary Barham Gray
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Holly Eileen Ortiz
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Perry
Represented By
Mary Barham Gray
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Holly Eileen Ortiz
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Scott Siegfried
Represented By
Mary Barham Gray
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Holly Eileen Ortiz
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Brenda Smith
Represented By
Mary Barham Gray
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Holly Eileen Ortiz
Semple Farrington Everall & Case, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Maccagnan
Represented By
Patricia S. Bangert
Patricia S. Bangert, Attorney At Law, LLC
contact info

GPO Sep 18 2023
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply 102 is DENIED. SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/18/2023.(sphil, )

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
151 151 order Order Wed 03/05 9:00 PM
ORDER: Due to a conflict on the Court's Calendar, and pursuant to email communications between counsel and Chambers' staff, the Jury Trial set to commence on 4/7/2025 is VACATED and RESET to 7/28/2025, at 8:30 AM before Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello. This jury trial is set for five (5) days and is a FIRM trial setting. FURTHER ORDERED: The VTC Final Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/20/2025 is VACATED and RESET to 7/17/2025, at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello. Counsel are directed to contact Nicholas Richards (Nicholas_richards@cod.uscourts.gov), via email, not less than three days before the Conference for instructions on how to proceed with VTC. SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/5/2025. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
Related: [-]