California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:22-cv-00325
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2022
Terminated:May 01, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 30, 2023 4:12 PM PDT
Counter Claimant
Cymbiotika LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Grant
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Carly Klein
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
John Shaeffer
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Roes
Counter Defendant
Virun, Inc.
Represented By
Victor Balladares
Nevers Palazzo Packard Wildermuth And Wynner PC
contact info
Alisa S Edelson
Nevers Palazzo Packard Wildermuth And Wynner PC
contact info
Kazim A Naqvi
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Gary W Nevers
Nevers Palazzo Packard Wildermuth And Wynner PLC
contact info
Sharlene Denise Lee
Nevers Palazzo Packard Wildermuth And Wynner PC
contact info
Darren M. Franklin
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Kent R Raygor
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cymbiotika LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Grant
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Carly Klein
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
John Shaeffer
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Defendant
Shabab Elmi
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Grant
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Carly Klein
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
John Shaeffer
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chervin Jafarieh
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Grant
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Carly Klein
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
John Shaeffer
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Represented By
John Shaeffer
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Virun, Inc.
Represented By
Kazim A Naqvi
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Darren M. Franklin
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Kent R Raygor
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Philip Bromley
Represented By
Alisa S Edelson
Nevers Palazzo Packard Wildermuth And Wynner PC
contact info
Kazim A Naqvi
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Sharlene Denise Lee
Nevers Palazzo Packard Wildermuth And Wynner PC
contact info
Darren M. Franklin
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Kent R Raygor
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Cymbiotika LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Grant
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Carly Klein
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
John Shaeffer
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 23, 2024
205 205 stip Dismiss Case Fri 02/23 12:08 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FED. R. CIV. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff and CounterDefendant and Third-Party Defendant Philip Bromley, Virun, Inc., Virun, Inc..(Naqvi, Kazim)
Related: [-]