Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher M Alston
Case #: 2:22-bk-10320
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Apr 07, 2022
Terminated:May 11, 2022

Debtor
JAS Trucking LLC
13314 SE 255th St
Kent, WA 98042-6679
Represented By
David C. Smith
Attorney At Law
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Nancy L James
15008 63rd Dr SE
Snohomish, WA 98296
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101


Docket last updated: 03/02/2022 12:01 AM PST
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 03/01 4:56 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition ( 22-10320 [misc,1028] ( 338.00). Receipt number A27396690. Fee amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Creditors Uploaded Tue 03/01 5:02 PM
Creditor matrix uploaded/added 32 creditor(s). (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (OTC) Tue 03/01 4:53 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Non-Individual . Filed by David C. Smith on behalf of JAS Trucking LLC (Smith, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 WAWBApi Meeting of Creditors-Business Chapter 7 - No Asset Tue 03/01 4:58 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting Appointment of Interim Trustee James, Nancy L with to be held on 4/7/2022 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic Creditors Meeting Seattle. (Smith, David)
Related: [-]