California Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00037
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 02, 2022 11:23 PM PST
Defendant
Vladimir Alex Avdeyuk (1)
Represented By
Betty Jean Williams
Law Office Of Williams & Associates, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Miriam Hinman, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Feb 28 2022
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/25/22. (Kaminski, H)
GPO Nov 16 2022
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/14/22 GRANTING 26 Request to Seal. (Benson, A.)
GPO Nov 28 2022
JUDGMENT and COMMITMENT signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/28/2022. (Schultz, C)
GPO Nov 29 2022
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/29/22 as to Vladimir Alex Avdeyuk GRANTING 27 Motion to Seal Exhibit 1 in Support of Sentencing Memorandum. (Licea Chavez, V)
GPO Jan 19 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/19/23 EXTENDING surrender date of Vladimir Alex Avdeyuk to 02/06/23. (Benson, A.)

Docket last updated: 03/03/2022 12:00 AM PST
Friday, February 18, 2022
1 1 INFORMATION (Felony) as to Vladimir Alex Avdeyuk (1) counts 1-2. (Donati, J)
Related: [-]
2 2 AO257 (Sealed) as to Vladimir Alex Avdeyuk (Donati, J)
Related: [-]
3 3 REQUEST to Set Initial Appearance and to Issue Notice to Appear by USA as to Vladimir Alex Avdeyuk (Donati, J)
Related: [-]