Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Brian J Davis
Referred: Monte C Richardson
Case #: 3:22-cv-00230
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2022
Last checked: Monday Aug 29, 2022 5:02 AM EDT
Defendant
National Credit Systems, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324
Represented By
Ronnie Guillen
Ronnie Guillen
contact info
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By
Jason Daniel Joffe
Squire Patton Boggs (us), LLP
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Graziella Pastor
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
Amber Nye
Represented By
Max H. Story
Max Story
contact info
Austin James Griffin
Max Story, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Landon Nye
328 Second Avenue North
Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250
Represented By
Max H. Story
Max Story
contact info
Austin James Griffin
Max Story, Esq.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Terminated: 08/04/2022
1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
36 36 2 pgs order Order dismissing case Tue 11/29 4:17 PM
ORDERED: Plaintiffs' claims as to Defendant National Credit Systems, Inc are dismissed with prejudice, each party shall bear its own costs and fees. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and close the file. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/28/2022. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
35 35 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 11/18 2:36 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by National Credit Systems, Inc..(Guillen, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order of Dismissal
Thursday, October 06, 2022
34 34 2 pgs order Order Thu 10/06 4:26 PM
ORDERED: Plaintiffs' claims as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice, each party shall bear its own costs and fees. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. from the Court Docket. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 10/04/2022. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 10/03 3:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Amber Nye, Landon Nye. (Story, Max)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
32 32 2 pgs order Order Wed 08/10 4:41 PM
ORDERED: Plaintiffs and Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. shall file on or before October 3, 2022, a joint stipulated form of final order or judgment as to the claims raised against Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 08/09/2022. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
31 31 notice Notice of settlement Wed 08/03 3:51 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Pastor, Graziella)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs order Order Wed 08/03 10:17 AM
ORDERED: Plaintiffs' claims as to Defendant Trans Union, LLC are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Defendant Trans Union, LLC from the Court Docket. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 08/01/2022. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
29 29 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Fri 07/22 4:59 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Amber Nye, Landon Nye (Story, Max)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
28 28 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/31 2:00 PM
ORDERED: Plaintiffs and Defendant Trans Union, LLC shall file on or before July 25, 2022, a joint stipulated form of final order or judgment as to the claims raised against Defendant Trans Union, LLC. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/27/2022. (CKS)
Related: [-]
27 27 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/31 1:53 PM
ORDERED: Plaintiffs and Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, shall file on or before July 12, 2022, a joint stipulated form of final order or judgment as to the claims raised against Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 05/27/2022. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
26 26 notice Notice of settlement Tue 05/24 3:57 PM
NOTICE of settlement as to Trans Union Only by Amber Nye, Landon Nye (Griffin, Austin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
25 25 notice Notice of settlement Thu 05/12 4:53 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Amber Nye, Landon Nye (Story, Max)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
24 24 utility Case Referred to Mediation Wed 05/11 11:49 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (JDR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
23 23 order Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order Tue 05/10 3:33 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Conduct mediation hearing by 11/30/2022; Discovery due by 11/30/2022; Dispositive motions due by 4/14/2023; Pretrial statement due by 9/13/2023; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 10/2/2023 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/9/2022.(AMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mediation Report Form,
Att: 2 Docket Sheets
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/27 11:47 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions INC.(Pastor, Graziella)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
21 21 misc Case Management Report Mon 04/25 10:18 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Story, Max)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/31 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Pendency of other Actions by Amber Nye, Landon Nye re19 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Story, Max) (Modified on 3/31/2022 to edit docket text) (JDR)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/31 11:24 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Amber Nye, Landon Nye. (Story, Max)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
18 18 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/28 5:30 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by National Credit Systems, Inc.. (Guillen, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/28 5:23 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by National Credit Systems, Inc..(Guillen, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/28 10:51 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. On or before May 13, 2022, Defendant Equifax shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/28/2022. (MM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 03/24 3:27 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Equifax Information Services LLC. Related case(s): No (Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/24 3:26 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/24 3:25 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
12 12 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 03/22 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
11 11 service Summons returned executed Fri 03/18 11:20 AM
RETURN of service executed on 03/09/22 by Landon Nye, Amber Nye as to Trans Union, LLC. (Story, Max)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons returned executed Fri 03/18 11:19 AM
RETURN of service executed on 03/07/22 by Landon Nye, Amber Nye as to National Credit Systems, Inc.. (Story, Max)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons returned executed Fri 03/18 11:18 AM
RETURN of service executed on 03/07/22 by Landon Nye, Amber Nye as to Experian Information Solutions INC. (Story, Max)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons returned executed Fri 03/18 11:16 AM
RETURN of service executed on 03/09/22 by Landon Nye, Amber Nye as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (Story, Max)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2022
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 03/17 11:40 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. On or before April 27, 2022, Defendant Experian shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/17/2022. (MM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Wed 03/16 5:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions INC. (Pastor, Graziella)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/16 5:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Experian Information Solutions INC identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions INC. (Pastor, Graziella)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of appearance Wed 03/16 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Graziella Pastor on behalf of Experian Information Solutions INC (Pastor, Graziella)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
3 3 service Summons issued Thu 03/03 3:57 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions INC, National Credit Systems, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. (JDR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/02 11:38 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:22-cv-0230-BJD-MCR. (SJB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/02 10:47 AM
COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC,, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC, National Credit Systems, Inc., Trans Union, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19291848) filed by Landon and Amber Nye.(Story, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Proposed Summons,
Att: 9 Proposed Summons,
Att: 10 Proposed Summons,
Att: 11 Proposed Summons