North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Loretta C Biggs
Referred: Joe L Webster
Case #: 1:22-cv-00164
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2022
Terminated:Mar 14, 2023
Last checked: Monday Aug 29, 2022 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
SLABWAY, LLC
858 S Automall Drive Suite 101 c/o Jason Harward, Registered Agent
American Fork, UT 84003
Plaintiff
OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.
Represented By
JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Brown, Faucher, Peraldo & Benson, PLLC
contact info

GPO Mar 13 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 03/13/2023, that Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED, (ECF No. 10), and that Default Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against the Defendant. Plaintiff shall have and recover the amount of $351,615.48, plus pre-judgment interest at the legal rate of 8% per annum from July 27, 2021, through the date of this judgment and post-judgment interest thereafter, plus the costs of this action. (Bowers, Alexis)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
13 13 misc Mail Returned Wed 03/29 2:53 PM
Envelope Containing12 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT addressed to Slabway, LLC, c/o Jason Harward, Registered Agent 858 S. Automall Drive, Suite 101, American Fork, UT 84003 returned to court by postal service, marked undeliverable because Return to Sender, Insufficient address, unable to forward. (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
12 12 3 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Tue 03/14 8:17 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 03/13/2023, that Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED, (ECF No.10 ), and that Default Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against the Defendant. Plaintiff shall have and recover the amount of $351,615.48, plus pre-judgment interest at the legal rate of 8% per annum from July 27, 2021, through the date of this judgment and post-judgment interest thereafter, plus the costs of this action. (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
utility Motions Submitted Thu 05/26 1:48 PM
Motion Submitted:10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to SLABWAY, LLC to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
11 11 respm Brief Tue 05/03 6:13 PM
BRIEF re10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to SLABWAY, LLC . (FAUCHER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Default Judgment Tue 05/03 6:10 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to SLABWAY, LLC by OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.. Response to Motion due by 5/24/2022 (FAUCHER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Mon 05/02 12:17 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default signed by Gloria L. Powell, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 05/02/2022 for failure to file a claim and an answer or otherwise defend. (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Response - non motion Mon 05/02 11:28 AM
RESPONSE by Plaintiff OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC. re6 Letter . (FAUCHER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Entry of Default Mon 05/02 11:18 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default by OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC..(FAUCHER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of James R. Faucher,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default
Thursday, April 28, 2022
6 6 misc Letter Thu 04/28 11:20 AM
Letter to Plaintiff's counsel as to Defendant Slabway, LLC re Answer due 03/28/2022. (Blay, Debbie)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Mon 04/11 10:12 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to SLABWAY, LLC served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022.(FAUCHER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit USPS Service Receipt
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Right to Consent Wed 03/02 2:46 PM
Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 03/02 2:45 PM
Summons Issued as to SLABWAY, LLC. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/02 12:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.. (FAUCHER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/02 11:56 AM
COMPLAINT against SLABWAY, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3248797), filed by OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC. (FAUCHER, JAMES) Modified on 3/2/2022 to remove duplicate text. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verification,
Att: 2 Exhibit Statement of Account,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons
utility Case Referred to Mediation Wed 03/02 2:48 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned Wed 03/02 3:46 PM
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]