Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Leslie Hoffman Price
Referred: Embry J Kidd
Case #: 6:22-cv-00444
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2022
Case in other court:Texas Eastern, 4:21-cv-00462
Last checked: Monday Aug 29, 2022 6:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Entrust Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Grey Squires-Binford
Killgore, Pearlman, Semanie, Denius & Squires, P.A.
contact info
Douglas Paul Gerber
Killgore, Pearlman, Semanie, Denius & Squires, P.A.
contact info
William Nelson Drabble
Gray Reed & Mcgraw Llp - Dallas
contact info
Andrew K. York
Gray Reed & Mcgraw Llp - Dallas
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan M. Yasko
Represented By
Grey Squires-Binford
Killgore, Pearlman, Semanie, Denius & Squires, P.A.
contact info
Douglas Paul Gerber
Killgore, Pearlman, Semanie, Denius & Squires, P.A.
contact info
William Nelson Drabble
Gray Reed & Mcgraw Llp - Dallas
contact info
Andrew K. York
Gray Reed & Mcgraw Llp - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
First National Title Insurance Company
Represented By
Timothy James Kiley
Winderweedle, Haines, Ward & Woodman, PA
contact info
Stephen Alexander Khoury
Kelsoe, Khoury, Rogers & Clark, PC
contact info
Mya M. Hatchette
Maynard Cooper & Gale PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, March 11, 2022
46 46 utility *Remark Fri 03/11 10:38 AM
ALL FURTHER FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE NUMBER 6:21-cv-00526-LHP. (ARJ)
Related: [-]
45 45 3 pgs order Order Fri 03/11 10:20 AM
ORDER: The following cases are hereby consolidated: (1) Entrust Solutions, LLC et al. v. First Nat'l Title Ins. Co., Case No. 6:21-cv-526-LHP and (2) First Nat'l Title Ins. Co. v. Entrust Enters. LLC et al., Case No. 6:22-cv-444-LHP. The parties are DIRECTED to make all future filings in the 2021 Action. The parties will follow the Case Management and Scheduling Order in the 2021 Action (2021 Action, Doc. 20). Given the representations made in the parties' Joint Notice filed in the 2021 Action (2021 Action, Doc. 46), and in order to proceed with the consolidated cases in the most efficient manner, the undersigned will be setting this case for an in-person status conference. The hearing will be scheduled by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 3/11/2022. (TYI)
Related: [-]
utility Create case association Fri 03/11 10:36 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 6:21-cv-00526-LHP. (ARJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
44 44 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/10 4:37 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:22-cv-0444-LHP. Judge Paul G. Byron no longer assigned to the case. (SJB)
Related: [-]
43 43 order *Order pdf Thu 03/10 1:08 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING this case to United States Magistrate Judge Hoffman Price for her consolidation. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to remove United States District Judge Paul G. Byron from the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/10/2022. (CPH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
42 42 minutes Telephone Conference Wed 03/09 1:12 PM
Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Byron: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/9/2022. Court Reporter: Koretta Stanford (GNB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
41 41 notice Notice of appearance Tue 03/08 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy James Kiley on behalf of First National Title Insurance Company (Kiley, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
40 40 notice Notice of appearance Mon 03/07 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Paul Gerber on behalf of Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Jonathan M. Yasko (Gerber, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2022
39 39 notice Notice of hearing Fri 03/04 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 3/9/2022 at 10:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4B before Judge Paul G. Byron. The parties shall call 888-363-4735 ten (10) minutes before the hearing is set to begin. Access Code: 3126210. Security Code: 030922. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
38 38 order *Order pdf Thu 03/03 9:11 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/3/2022. (PML)
Related: [-]
37 37 2 pgs order Order to comply with electronic filing Thu 03/03 8:28 AM
ORDER for Stephen Khoury, Andrew York, and William Drabble to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/3/2022. (GNB)
Related: [-]
36 36 11 pgs order Order Thu 03/03 8:24 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/3/2022. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
35 35 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 03/02 12:54 PM
NOTICE to counsel Stephen Alexander Khoury, Andrew K. York and William Nelson Drabble of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RDO) Modified on 3/2/2022 (RDO)
Related: [-]
34 34 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/02 11:54 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Paul G. Byron. New case number: 6:22-cv-00444-PGB-EJK. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (BCW)
Related: [-]
33 33 transfer District transfer in Wed 03/02 11:39 AM
TRANSFER IN from the Eastern District of Texas. Case assigned to District Judge Sharp and Magistrate Judge Kidd. New Case Number: 6:22-cv-00444-GKS-EJK. (BCW)
Related: [-]
32 32 transfer Case transferred in - district transfer Wed 03/02 11:35 AM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00462. File received electronically
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
31 31 1 pgs MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants Entrust Enterprises, LLC, and Jonathan Yasko's Motion to Transfer Venue, (Dkt. #7 ), is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 2/8/2022. (rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Note: The case will be transferred to United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division 20 days from the date the Order of Transfer was entered on the docket, per Local Rule CV-83(b). (rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
30 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court recommends that Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue (Dkt.7 ) be GRANTED. The Court recommends this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division for further disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 1/7/2022. (rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
29 29 NOTICE by First National Title Insurance Company(Khoury, Stephen) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the28 Additional Attachments to Main Document submitted by First National Title Insurance Company. The letter should be filed as an attachment to a pleading and filed using event Notice. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
28 28 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Additional Attachments to Main Document:. (Khoury, Stephen) Modified on 12/13/2021 (rpc, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
27 27 NOTICE by Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Jonathan M. Yasko [Notice of Filing in a Related Action](Drabble, William) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Monday, December 06, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak: Motion Hearing held on 12/6/2021 re7 MOTION to Change Venue [Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue] filed by Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Jonathan M. Yasko,10 MOTION to Remand filed by First National Title Insurance Company. Case called at 2:55 p.m. Stephen Khoury appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Bill Drabble appeared on behalf of Defendants. Court heard oral argument from Parties on Motions. Parties in agreement substantial overlap exists and Florida is first-filed. Parties may provide supplemental briefing, if any, by 5:00 p.m. Friday, December 10, 2021. By this same date, counsel shall confirm Middle District of Florida provided notice of these proceedings. Court adjourned at 3:40 p.m. (Court Reporter Digital Video.) (klee, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
26 26 ORDER Rescheduling Videoconference Hearing on7 MOTION to Change Venue [Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue] and10 MOTION to Remand: Motion Videoconference Hearing rescheduled for 12/6/2021 at 02:30 PM in Video Conf Rm (Sherman) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 12/1/2021. (rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
25 25 ORDER Setting Videoconference Hearing on7 MOTION to Change Venue [Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue] and10 MOTION to Remand: Motion Videoconference Hearing set for 11/30/2021 at 02:30 PM in Video Conf Rm (Sherman) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/17/2021. (rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
24 24 STATUS REPORT by First National Title Insurance Company.(Khoury, Stephen) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Florida Court Order re: Mediation
Saturday, October 30, 2021
23 23 ORDER granting17 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff's Response to the Motion to Transfer [Dkt.11 ] and Plaintiff's Sur-reply [Dkt.18 ] are deemed properly before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/30/2021. (rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
22 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Motion to Transfer filed by First National Title Insurance Company . (Khoury, Stephen) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
21 21 RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Motion to Transfer [Defendants' Response to the Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue and Response to Motion to Transfer Venue] filed by Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Jonathan M. Yasko . (Drabble, William) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
20 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Remand filed by First National Title Insurance Company . (Khoury, Stephen) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
19 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Remand [Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Request for Attorneys Fees] filed by Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Jonathan M. Yasko .(Drabble, William) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, August 02, 2021
18 18 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Change Venue [Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue] filed by First National Title Insurance Company . (Khoury, Stephen) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
17 17 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Motion to Transfer by First National Title Insurance Company.(Khoury, Stephen) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the16 MOTION for Leave to File submitted by First National Title Insurance Company. The Motion is missing a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
16 16 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by First National Title Insurance Company.(Khoury, Stephen) Modified on 8/2/2021 (rpc, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Surreply,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
15 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Change Venue [Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue] filed by Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Jonathan M. Yasko . (Drabble, William) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
14 14 ORDER - granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re10 MOTION to Remand . Responses due by 8/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 7/20/2021. (baf, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 19, 2021
13 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION to Remand by Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Jonathan M. Yasko.(Drabble, William) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, July 16, 2021
12 12 REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS this case to U. S. Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 7/16/2021. (rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
11 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Change Venue [Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue] filed by First National Title Insurance Company .(Khoury, Stephen) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Loan Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Guaranty Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Promissory Note,
Att: 4 Exhibit Email Correspondence,
Att: 5 Exhibit Demand Letter,
Att: 6 Exhibit Florida Lawsuit Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Text of Proposed Order
10 10 MOTION to Remand by First National Title Insurance Company.(Khoury, Stephen) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit Defendants' Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit Loan Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit Promissory Note,
Att: 5 Exhibit Guaranty Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the8 RESPONSE in Opposition submitted by First National Title Insurance Company. The exhibits were not filed as separate attachments. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the9 Motion to Remand submitted by First National Title Insurance Company. The Motion is missing a Certificate of Conference, exhibits must be attached as separate documents, and a proposed order. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
9 9 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Remand by First National Title Insurance Company. (Khoury, Stephen) Modified on 7/15/2021 (rpc, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
8 8 R ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** ESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Change Venue [Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue] filed by First National Title Insurance Company . (Khoury, Stephen) Modified on 7/15/2021 (rpc, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
7 7 MOTION to Change Venue [Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue] by Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Jonathan M. Yasko.(Drabble, William) (rpc, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet (Fla Case),
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal (Fla Case),
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint (Fla Case)
Att: 4 (6/23/2021) Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
6 6 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 6/22/2021. (rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
5 5 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to4 Complaint by Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Jonathan M. Yasko.(rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
4 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Jonathan M. Yasko, filed by First National Title Insurance Company.(rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit b,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 18, 2021
3 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Jonathan M Yasko (Drabble, William) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew K. York on behalf of Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Jonathan M Yasko (York, Andrew) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 17, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jonathan M Yasko, Entrust Enterprises, LLC from 429th Judicial District Court, Collin County, TX, case number 429--02050-2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8460706), filed by Jonathan M Yasko, Entrust Enterprises, LLC.(Drabble, William) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certified Docket Sheet and all pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet
Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/2/2022.]
Related: [-]